Prescott, City of v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Prescott, City of
Defendant: Actavis Incorporated, Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Beverly Sackler, Purdue Pharma LP, Randy Joe Spicer, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Mortimer DA Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Allergan PLC, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Theresa Sackler, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Unknown Parties, Cephalon Incorporated, Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Douglas J Campbell, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, David Sackler, Amerisourcebergen, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, John N Kapoor and Watson Pharma Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08165
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #30 Plaintiff has an additional 90 days, or until October 20, 2019, to complete service of process of the Summons and Complaint on all Defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/31/2019. (TCA)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Defendants deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and the parties deadline to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference are extended until 30 days following i) this Courts ruling onPlaintiffs Motion to Remand, or ii) a final decision by the JPML on whether to transfer this action to the Opiate MDL, whichever occurs first.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Conference scheduled for July 31, 2019 is vacated, to be rescheduled if a final determination is made that this case is to remain in this Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA)
July 26, 2019 Remark: As to out of state counsel Joshua Campbell - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party of parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 40 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Prescott, City of: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Attorney Certificate Regarding A.R.S. 12-2603 upon Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on July 24, 2019. (Gooch, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 Joinder re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Douglas J Campbell. (Skelton, J)
July 24, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by J Russell Skelton on behalf of Douglas J Campbell. (Skelton, J)
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Actavis Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Submitted by Prescott, City of. (Freeman, Scott)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 *Joint MOTION/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(F) Planning Conference by Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Sixkiller, Laura). *Added MOTION for Extension of Time and corrected motion type on 7/23/2019 (REK).
July 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE re: Notice of Stay Order by Insys Therapeutics Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Myers, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #25 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Amerisourcebergen. (Kastner, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST re: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY by Plaintiff Prescott, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - G, #2 Exhibit Exhibits H - I, #3 Exhibit Exhibits J - M)(Gooch, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #25 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Prescott, City of. (Gooch, John)
July 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Todd Theodora on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Jeffrey H Reeves, Cheryl Priest Ainsworth, Jessica Starr Diotalevi, and Kevin Neal Royer on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service of Summons and Complaint and Request for Alternative Service for Michael Babich by Prescott, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service for Michael Babich)(Gooch, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Prescott, City of. (Gooch, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Prescott, City of: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on June 13, 2019 to Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt . (Gooch, John)
June 27, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Steven Boranian on behalf of defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The #19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Manufacturing Defendants to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Mallinckrodt, LLC; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Purdue Pharma L.P.; Purdue Pharma Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company; Inc., and Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (collectively, the "Manufacturing Defendants") may have up to and including July 31, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/24/19. (GMP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Joan Axel on behalf of John N Kapoor. (Axel, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Amerisourcebergen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastner, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amerisourcebergen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kastner, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE re: Service by Prescott, City of re: #21 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Gooch, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/13/2019. (TCA)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/13/2019. (TCA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 *NOTICE of Errata re: #19 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Defendant Insys Therapeutics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit corrected proposed form of Order) (Myers, Michael) *Modified to add document linkage on 6/13/2019 (GMP).
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Manufacturing Defendants to Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Insys Therapeutics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Myers, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP. (Sixkiller, Laura)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sixkiller, Laura)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Insys Therapeutics Incorporated. (Myers, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insys Therapeutics Incorporated. (Myers, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stephen Myers on behalf of Insys Therapeutics Incorporated. (Myers, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-8165-PCT-8165. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Prescott, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, Scott)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Prescott, City of. Party McKesson Corporation terminated. (Freeman, Scott)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Prescott, City of. Party Randy Joe Spicer (named as Dr., an individual) terminated. (Freeman, Scott)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Weiss, Jon)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for Amerisourcebergen. (Kastner, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Actavis Incorporated, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (MCO)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16995186. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-8165-PCT-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Stine, Lauren) (MCO)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number P1300cv201900393. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16995186 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Stine, Lauren) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(MCO)
June 3, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED ANSWER to Complaint by Randy Joe Spicer.(MCO)
June 3, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Attorney Certificate/Certificate of Arbitration upon Insys Therapeutics Incorporated on 4/24/2019. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescott, City of v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Joe Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Roger N Morris
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Elliott Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer DA Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Schulman
Represented By: Joseph L Franco
Represented By: Michael Stephen Myers
Represented By: J Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Campbell
Represented By: Joshua Campbell
Represented By: J Russell Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Incorporated
Represented By: Jon David Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen
Represented By: John James Kastner, Jr.
Represented By: Steven James Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N Kapoor
Represented By: Michelle Marie Buckley
Represented By: Jennifer Joan Axel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescott, City of
Represented By: Scott Day Freeman
Represented By: John Peter Kaites
Represented By: Jessica Hernandez Diotalevi
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: Todd C Theodora
Represented By: John Christopher Gooch
Represented By: Kevin R Royer
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Todd Christopher Theodora
Represented By: Jessica Starr Diotalevi
Represented By: Kevin Neal Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?