Chapman v. Prescott Station Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Chapman
Defendant: Robert Gabrick, Prescott Station Incorporated and Linda Gabrick
Case Number: 3:2019cv08208
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Approval of Settlement Agreement by Prescott Station Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lovell, Andrea)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that a Stipulation to Dismiss shall be filed on or before September 30, 2019. If a Stipulation has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report on that date. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/28/2019. (LFIG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Prescott Station Incorporated. (Lovell, Andrea)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving the #11 Stipulation and granting a one-time extension of time until 8/30/2019 for Defendant Prescott Station Incorporated to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/7/2019. (LFIG)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Orders by Robert Chapman . (Bendau, Clifford)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Prescott Station Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(llLovell, Andrea)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/2/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Chapman: Declaration of Service re: Complaint, Summonses, and Order upon Linda Gabrick on 7/21/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Chapman: Declaration of Service re: Complaint, Summonses, and Order upon Robert Gabrick on 7/21/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Chapman: Declaration of Service re: Complaint, Summonses, and Order upon Prescott Station on 7/21/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/17/2019. (MMO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Linda Gabrick, Robert Gabrick, Prescott Station Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17170013. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8208-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Chapman. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17170013 filed by Robert Chapman. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Prescott Station Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chapman
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gabrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Station Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Shawn Oller
Represented By: Andrea G Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Gabrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?