Torck et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Judy L Torck and Norman R Torck
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08219
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Northern District of California. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-5330. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 23, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17199065. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-08219-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Judy L Torck, Norman R Torck. (Diamond, David) (BAR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17199065 filed by Norman R Torck, Judy L Torck. (Diamond, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torck et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy L Torck
Represented By: David J Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman R Torck
Represented By: David J Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?