Fennell v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Debra Fennell
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08228
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Northern District of California. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-5228. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Laura J Baughman on behalf of Plaintiff Debra Fennell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ben C Martin on behalf of Plaintiff Debra Fennell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 20, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Debra Fennell: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Monsanto Company on August 2, 2019. (Crowell, Ashley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Debra Fennell. (Crowell, Ashley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Debra Fennell. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Debra Fennell. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17225109. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8228-PCT-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Debra Fennell. (Crowell, Ashley) (MFR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17225109 filed by Debra Fennell. (Crowell, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennell v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Fennell
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?