Thurgood v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Thurgood
Defendant: Antelope Point Holdings LLC, Unknown Party, Hallum Incorporated, Golden Gate/SET Petroleum Partners of Nevada LLC and Diamond Trucking Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08236
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that, as a result of consolidation (Doc. #21 ) the 11/13/2019 status conference set in CV 19-8236 is vacated. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/7/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (59) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:19-cv-08109-MTL. All future filings shall be in LEAD CASE No. CV-19-08109-PCT-MTL and use the above-referenced caption. Further, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Modify Rule 16 Scheduling Order, and good cause appearing, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the 57 Stipulation. The following deadline extensions apply to this case. The deadline for joining parties, amending pleading sand filing supplemental pleadings is December 31, 2019. The deadline for final supplementation of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot ("MIDP") responses and the completion of fact discovery is April 19, 2020. The deadline for Plaintiffs' expert disclosures is May 22, 2020. The deadline for Defendant's expert disclosures is June 26, 2020. The deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures is August 28, 2020. The deadline for expert depositions is August 28, 2020. The deadline for dispositive motions is September 28, 2020. The deadline for engaging in good faith settlement talks is September 15, 2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report by October 11, 2019 addressing whether the 43 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and subsequent briefing remains pending and contested in light of the consolidation. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/3/19. (Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-08109-MTL, 3:19-cv-08236-SMB) (GMP)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Antelope Point Holdings LLC.(Guerrieri, Felice)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Diamond Trucking Incorporated, Golden Gate/SET Petroleum Partners of Nevada LLC, Hallum Incorporated. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Guerrieri, Felice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Ryan Thurgood.(Tokar, Paul)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Antelope Point Holdings LLC, Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: 19-cv-08109,19-cv-08236) (Guerrieri, Felice)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/24/2019. (TCA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Antelope Point Holdings LLC.(Guerrieri, Felice)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Thurgood: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 14, 2019 to Antelope Point Holdings LLC d/b/a Antelope Point Marina . (Tokar, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David P Beitchman, Paul Tokar on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Thurgood. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/2019. (TCA)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/2019. (TCA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17279655. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8236-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (DLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17279655 filed by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurgood v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Thurgood
Represented By: David P Beitchman
Represented By: Jesse Morgan Showalter
Represented By: Paul Tokar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Point Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallum Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate/SET Petroleum Partners of Nevada LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?