Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reynolds
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08264
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marcelo Illarmo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Illarmo, Marcelo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Kimberly Reynolds. (Phillips, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kimberly Reynolds . (Phillips, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Kimberly Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Assignment of EAJA fee, #3 Summons)(Phillips, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John E Phillips on behalf of Kimberly Reynolds. (Phillips, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX212131. (MSA)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee by 9/25/2019, or the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss this case (without prejudice). Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 9/11/2019. (RMW)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioner's decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's answering brief. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/10/19. (MSA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-08264-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kimberly Reynolds. (REK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kimberly Reynolds. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reynolds
Represented By: John E Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?