Shaffer et al v. American Medical Systems Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Shaffer and Richard L Shaffer
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, American Medical Systems Incorporated and American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08279
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing MIDP by Patricia Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Combs, C)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26 (f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than December 5, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/6/19. (MAW)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-8279-PCT-DWL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 2, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that Patricia Shaffer, Richard L Shaffer show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
October 31, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for J Robert Bell, III on behalf of Plaintiffs Patricia Shaffer and Richard L Shaffer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph A Osborne, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Patricia Shaffer, Richard L Shaffer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated, American Medical Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated, American Medical Systems Incorporated. (Merrett, Andre)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer by American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated, American Medical Systems Incorporated.(Merrett, Andre)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Merrett, Andre)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer by Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(Merrett, Andre)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated, American Medical Systems Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17451410. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8279-PCT-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Shaffer, Richard L Shaffer. (Combs, C) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17451410 filed by Patricia Shaffer, Richard L Shaffer. (Combs, C) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer et al v. American Medical Systems Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shaffer
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Represented By: J Robert Bell, III
Represented By: Joseph A Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Shaffer
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Represented By: J Robert Bell, III
Represented By: Joseph A Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?