Coleman et al v. Craig et al
Plaintiff: Gary Coleman, Carrie Coleman and Carrie Mora
Defendant: Cathy Craig, John R Carsten and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2019cv08310
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants Gary and Carrie Coleman's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause dated December 17, 2019 (Doc. #15 ) is quashed. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/20/19. (EJA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #15 Scheduling Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by Plaintiff Gary Coleman. (Rasner, Bret)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 EX PARTE First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Gary Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Rasner, Bret)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs show cause by December 23, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (1) why the federal claims should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim or submit a proposed amended complaint by that time and (2) why the fictional defendants should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Dispositive motions due by 4/17/2020. The Court will hold a conference with the parties before motions for summary judgment are filed on April 7, 2020 at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles has been randomly drawn to conduct a settlement conference in this case. Counsel shall contact Judge Bibles' chambers to schedule the conference. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/17/19. (SLQ)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2019. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Bret Rasner for Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants. Troy Foster for Defendants/Counterclaimants. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 1:35 PM to 2:17 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 *Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Gary Coleman and Carrie Coleman. (Rasner, Bret) *Modified to add filer on 12/6/2019 (EJA).
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Counter Claimants John R Carsten, Cathy Craig, Defendants John R Carsten, Cathy Craig. (Foster, Troy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Gary Coleman. (Rasner, Bret)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12 (c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/15/19. (MSA)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Gary Coleman. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Gary Coleman.(Rasner, Bret)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 12/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/28/19. (EJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Cathy Craig, John R Carsten.(Foster, Troy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Cover Sheet by Defendants John R Carsten, Cathy Craig. (Foster, Troy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by John R Carsten, Cathy Craig. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17550361. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8310-PCT-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number P1300CV201900706. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17550361 filed by Cathy Craig, John R Carsten. (Foster, Troy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coleman
Represented By: Martin Joseph Coleman
Represented By: Bret Rasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Coleman
Represented By: Martin Joseph Coleman
Represented By: Bret Rasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Mora
Represented By: Martin Joseph Coleman
Represented By: Bret Rasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Craig
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Carsten
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?