Baleno v. MVP Health Care Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Baleno
Defendant: MVP Health Services Corporation, MVP Health Plan Incorporated, Unknown Parties and MVP Health Care Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv08023
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MVP Health Care Incorporated, MVP Health Plan Incorporated, MVP Health Services Corporation. (Gorton, Adrianna)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MVP Health Care Incorporated, MVP Health Plan Incorporated, MVP Health Services Corporation.(Gorton, Adrianna)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The Stipulation for Extension #8 is granted. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to March 26, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/26/2020. (LMR)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kathleen Baleno. (Massey, Daniel)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 27, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MVP Health Care Incorporated, MVP Health Plan Incorporated, MVP Health Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17872729. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08023-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kathleen Baleno. (Massey, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17872729 filed by Kathleen Baleno. (Massey, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Jury Demand)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baleno v. MVP Health Care Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Health Services Corporation
Represented By: Adrianna Griego Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Health Plan Incorporated
Represented By: Adrianna Griego Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Health Care Incorporated
Represented By: Adrianna Griego Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Baleno
Represented By: Daniel P Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?