Watson et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Doreene Watson and Estate of Roger A Watson
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Unknown Parties, Bank of America NA, Reconstrust, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv08026
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss such that the Court shall consider the Response filed on 3/9/2020. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/17/2020. (RMW)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Reconstrust. (Pollock, Bradley) *Modified linkage on 3/17/2020 (DXD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Reconstrust . (Pollock, Bradley)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Estate of Roger A Watson. (Solomon, Sterling) *Modified to reflect as duplicative of #12 Response on 3/10/2020 (DXD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Doreene Watson, Estate of Roger A Watson. (Solomon, Sterling) *Modified to add filer/ text on 3/10/2020 (DXD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 **WRONG PDF attached - Motion termed** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Estate of Roger A Watson. (Attachments: #1 Order on Motion to Extend Time)(Solomon, Sterling) *Modified as duplicative/ correct event on 3/10/2020 (DXD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Doreene Watson, Estate of Roger A Watson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Sterling) *Modified to add filer/ correct event on 3/10/2020 (DXD).
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Reconstrust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Pollock, Bradley) *Modified to correct event on 3/10/2020 (DXD).
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Donald Balser on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. (Balser, Justin)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/3/2020. (RMV)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17897026. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08026-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reconstrust. (Pollock, Bradley) (BAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America NA. (Pollock, Bradley) (BAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Pollock, Bradley) (BAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Apache County Superior Court, case number CV2019-00192. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17897026 filed by Reconstrust, Federal National Mortgage Association, Bank of America NA, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP. (Pollock, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Coversheet, #3 Exhibits)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstrust
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreene Watson
Represented By: Sterling Trent Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Roger A Watson
Represented By: Sterling Trent Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?