Smith v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dean Howard Smith
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv08073
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Service of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Dean Howard Smith re: #8 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Ronstadt, Erin)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/15/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dean Howard Smith: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/6/20 to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. . (Ronstadt, Erin)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/2/2020. (LFIG)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (LAD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (LAD)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18136438. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08073-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LAD)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Dean Howard Smith. (Submitted by Erin Ronstadt) (LAD)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18136438 filed by Dean Howard Smith. (Submitted by Erin Ronstadt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Howard Smith
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?