Smith v. Unknown Party
Petitioner: Joshua Smith
Respondent: Unknown Party
Case Number: 3:2020cv08125
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Correction of Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joshua Smith. (SST) (1 page)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Smith. (2 pages) (See Order 8 for information regarding this entry) (WLP)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joshua Smith. (6 pages) (See Order #8 for information regarding this entry) (WLP)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must re-docket the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) (Doc. 5) in Smith v. Schuster, CV 20-08141-PCT-MTL (JFM). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 7/21/2020. (WLP)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) (Doc. #5 ) is denied. (2) Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). (3) If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas) within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. (4) The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the court-approved form for filing a for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 6/19/2020. (WLP)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Smith. (8 pages) (WLP)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joshua Smith. (2 pages) (WLP)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) terminating Unknown Party filed by Joshua Smith. (9 pages) (WLP)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The Court construes this action as seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241. (2) Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (3) If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. (4) Petitioner's 2241 Petition (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner has 30 days from the date of filing of this Order to file an amended 2241 petition in compliance with this Order. (5) If Petitioner fails to file an amended petition within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (6) The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the current court-approved form for filing a "Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 For A Writ Of Habeas Corpus By A Person In Federal Custody" and the current court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 6/2/2020. (WLP)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (WLP)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Joshua Smith. (4 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?