Sloan v. USA
Petitioner: Eli Sloan
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv08133
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
2 Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document - Exculpatory [Crime] Scene Reconstruction re: #5 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Eli Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LAD) (80 pages)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document - Declaration re: #5 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Eli Sloan. (LAD) (48 pages)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Order to Declare Attorney-Client Privilege Waived by Petitioner Eli Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LAD) (8 pages)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying without prejudice the United States of America's Motion for Order to Declare Attorney-Client Privilege Waived (Doc. #11 ). Respondent can renew the motion if and as necessary after the waiver is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice the United States of America's Motion to Unseal Determination of Counsel Hearing Transcript and Related Documents (Doc. #11 ). Respondent can renew the motion to unseal after the waiver is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen days of the date of this Order Movant must either (1) file a signed copy of the Waiver attached as Exhibit A to this Order; or (2) file a notice of withdrawal of his claims of ineffective assistance of counsel. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/14/2020. (LAD)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Movant's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Prisoner (Habeas) (Doc. #10 ) as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/14/2020. (LAD)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Respondent's Motion for a Sixty Day Extension of Time to Respond to Movant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Doc. #12 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent must answer Movant's motion on or before October 14, 2020; Movant may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer to the 2255 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/14/2020. (LAD)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Movant's Motions for Appointment of Counsel (Docs. #7 , #9 ) are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Movant's request for supplies (Doc. #7 ). IT IS FURTHER ODERED granting, in part, Movant's request for information to the extent stated above (Doc. #7 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/14/2020. (LAD)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Alanna)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Declare Attorney-Client Privilege Waived and Motion to Unseal Determination of Counsel Hearing Transcript and Related Documents by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Alanna)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eli Sloan. (3 pages) (REK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eli Sloan. (4 pages) (WLP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE - Certificate of Service re: #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eli Sloan. (SST) (1 page)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eli Sloan. (SST) (2 pages)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Alanna Kennedy appearing for USA. Attorney Alexander W Samuels and Sharon K Sexton terminated. . (Kennedy, Alanna)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR-15-8232-001-PCT-DLR filed by Eli Sloan. (LAD)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order (2255) - Movant's Motion for Leave to File an Overlong Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Doc. #1 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court must file the Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (currently docketed at Doc. #3 ). The Clerk of Court must electronically serve a copy of the as-filed 2255 Motion (currently docketed at Doc. #3 in CV 20-08133-PCT-DLR (DMF)) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the 2255 Motion in the civil case. The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona or his designee has 60 days from the date of service within which to answer the 2255 Motion. The United States Attorney or his designee must not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer. Movant may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer to the 2255 Motion. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Copy of 2255 Motion #3 )(LAD)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 * (Filed at Doc. #5 ) LODGED Proposed Motion Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 re: #1 MOTION for Leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Eli Sloan. (LAD) (95 pages) Modified on 6/16/2020 (LAD).
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 Motion for Leave of Court to File Oversized MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR-15-8232-PCT-DLR-1 filed by Eli Sloan. (2 pages)(HLA) Modified on 6/4/2020 (HLA). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2020: #1 Envelope) (HLA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sloan v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eli Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Sharon K Sexton
Represented By: Alexander W Samuels
Represented By: Alanna Rachel Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?