Ficker v. Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Amy Ficker
Defendant: Louis Oliver, Kenneth J Parillo, Arthur Weaver, Unknown Weaver, Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated, Unknown Oliver and Karen Parillo
Case Number: 3:2020cv08135
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action filed by Amy Ficker. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amy Ficker. (Smith, Stephen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant filed by Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type, not all caps. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated. (Grasso, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/8/2020. (MMO)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/8/2020. (MMO)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated. (Grasso, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated. (BAC)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18355927. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08135-PCT-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mohave County Superior Court, case number S8015CV202000397. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18355927 filed by Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated. (Grasso, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ficker v. Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J Parillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado River Condominiums Association Incorporated
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: Robert James Lydford
Represented By: Robert Grasso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Parillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Ficker
Represented By: William A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?