Jones v. USA
Petitioner: Willie Byron Jones, Sr.
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv08153
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's Order filed August 18, 2020, movants motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (LAD)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - (1) The Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Doc. 74 in CR 13-08014-PCT-GMS) is denied and the civil action opened in connection with this Motion (CV 20-08153-PCT-GMS (DMF)) is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. (2) Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, in the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/18/2020. (LAD)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Under General Order 16-20 by Willie Byron Jones, Sr re: #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Hilzendeger, Keith)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Willie Byron Jones, Sr. (13 pages) (HLA)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 *NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (HLA) *Modified to indicate error occurred while filing; re-filed correct at doc #4 on 6/25/2020 (CEI).
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 *MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)-(Davis or Residual Clause) re: Criminal Case No CR-13-8014-PCT-GMS-1 filed by Willie Byron Jones, Sr. (14 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelo;pe)(HLA) *Modified on 6/24/2020 (HLA); NEF regenerated on 6/26/2020 (CEI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Tracy Lyn Van Buskirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Byron Jones, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?