Holmes v. Summit et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Holmes
Defendant: William O'Leary, David Summit and Denise Summit
Case Number: 3:2020cv08215
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Order 6 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff filed an application in another case, Holmes v. Allstate Insurance Company et al, 3:20-cv-08082-SPL, on April 8, 2020, which she attempts to incorporate by reference. (Doc. #2 .) Her financial situation may not have changed in the past four months, but the Court nevertheless requires a new affidavit as proof that she again qualifies for in forma pauperis status. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must file an application which includes an affidavit stating her current assets, income, and expenses by September 1, 2020. The Court recommends the standard form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to so file, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice and terminate the action. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/18/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08215-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Sharon Holmes. (2 pages) (WLP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (styled as a written notice) by Sharon Holmes. (1 page) (WLP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Holmes. (3 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Summit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Summit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Summit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?