Maddox v. Yavapai, County of et al
Plaintiff: Kristopher Maddox
Defendant: Christina Maddox, Unknown Parties, Yavapai, County of and Robert Maddox
Case Number: 3:2020cv08216
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
2 Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULE: Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/30/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 4/29/2021. Telephonic Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 10/5/20. (EJA)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Christina Maddox, Robert Maddox, Yavapai, County of. (Masterson, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Christina Maddox, Robert Maddox, Yavapai, County of.(Masterson, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Nature of the Case" Paragraph of Plaintiff's Complaint) by Christina Maddox, Robert Maddox, Yavapai, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masterson, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kristopher Maddox: Certificate of Service re: Complaint; Summons; Notice of Assignment; Order upon Robert Maddox, Christina Maddox, on 09/09/2020. (Ramirez, Anthony) *Modified text on 9/24/2020 (EJA).
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Christina Maddox, Robert Maddox. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Kristopher Maddox. (Ramirez, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Kristopher Maddox. (Ramirez, Anthony)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Kristopher Maddox. The summons issued as to Robert Maddox and Christina Maddox cannot be issued. Only one summons can be submitted per defendant. The summonses for Yavapai Count Attorney's Office and Yavapai County Sheriff's Office cannot be issued as they are not parties to the case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit two separate summonses for Robert Maddox and Christina Maddox.. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Yavapai, County of. (EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff must either serve each Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each Defendant. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc. #2 . Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/20/20. (EJA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Kristopher Maddox. (Ramirez, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Kristopher Maddox. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kristopher Maddox. (Ramirez, Anthony) (DLC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18579871 filed by Kristopher Maddox. (Ramirez, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox v. Yavapai, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Maddox
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai, County of
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Maddox
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Maddox
Represented By: Anthony Jason Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?