Yazzie et al v. Hobbs
Plaintiff: Alfred McRoye, Darlene Yazzie, Leslie Begay, Caroline Begay, Donna Williams and Irene Roy
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Petitioner: National Republican Senatorial Committee, Arizona Republican Party, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Republican National Committee, Coconino County Republican Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee, Arizona Advocacy Network, National Republican Congressional Committee and Maricopa County Republican Committee
Case Number: 3:2020cv08222
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re: #71 MOTION to Dismiss Case OR REQUEST TIMEFRAME FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Katie Hobbs. (Desai, Roopali)
October 19, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Case OR REQUEST TIMEFRAME FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure, Chris)
October 12, 2020 Filing 69 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure, Chris)
October 9, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 10/9/2020. Plaintiffs' supplemental response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #48 shall be filed within ten (10) days. Defendant's reply shall be filed within the standard time limits from the filing of Plaintiffs' supplemental response. APPEARANCES: Chris McClure for Plaintiffs. Roopali Desai and Marty Harper for Defendant. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 2:32 PM to 2:39 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
October 2, 2020 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Katie Hobbs for proceedings held on 09/22/2020, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Desai, Roopali)
September 29, 2020 Filing 65 USCA Case Number re: #63 Notice of Appeal. Case number 20-16890, Ninth Circuit. (EJA)
September 28, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING proceedings for date of 09/22/2020 before Chief Judge G. MURRAY SNOW re: #63 Notice of Appeal. [Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers, RMR, FCRR, CCR, CMRS, Telephone number (602) 322-7250]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (RAP)
September 28, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie for proceedings held on 9/22/2020, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s) re: #63 Notice of Appeal. (McClure, Chris)
September 28, 2020 Filing 63 *NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #62 Order by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-18714308. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information Representation Statement)(McClure, Chris) *Modified to correct event type on 9/28/2020 (EJA).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Darlene Yazzie, Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, and Alfred McRoye's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #9 .) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Katie Hobbs' Motion in Limine (Doc. #51 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hold a telephonic status conference October 9, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Mountain Standard Time (Pacific Daylight Time) to discuss the timeline for responses to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's counsel shall set up a call-in number on or before Noon, October 6, 2020 and disseminate it to all parties, including the Court. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/25/20. (SLQ)
September 24, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of McClure, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit D)(McClure, Chris)
September 22, 2020 Filing 60 Exhibit List by Katie Hobbs. (KFZ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 59 Exhibit List by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (KFZ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 58 Witness List by Katie Hobbs. (KFZ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 57 Witness List by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (KFZ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2020. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement #51 Defendant's Motion in Limine/Motion to Strike, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:05 AM to 1:49 PM.(KFZ)
September 21, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #51 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Schroedel and Bret Healy Testimony at Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Motion to Strike Declaration MOTION to Strike filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of McClure, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(McClure, Chris)
September 21, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Anuradha Sivaram on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Sivaram, Anuradha)
September 21, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anuradha Sivaram on behalf of Defendant Katie Hobbs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 53 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of McClure, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(McClure, Chris) *Modified to correct document linkage on 9/21/2020 (GMP).
September 18, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 9/18/2020. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Chris McClure for Plaintiffs. Roopali Desai and Marty Harper for Defendant. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:32 AM to 10:48 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
September 18, 2020 Filing 51 *MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Schroedel and Bret Healy Testimony at Preliminary Injunction Hearing, MOTION to Strike Declaration by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Roopali). Added MOTION to Strike on 9/21/2020 (GMP).
September 18, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE re: Issues for September 18, 2020 Status Conference by Katie Hobbs . (Desai, Roopali)
September 17, 2020 Filing 49 *MOTION for Clarification re: #45 Order by Movants Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Maricopa County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct event on 9/18/2020 (GMP).
September 16, 2020 AMENDED Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John M Devaney on behalf of Movant Arizona Advocacy Network. Counsel incorrectly listed plaintiffs on pro hac vice motion and this information has been updated and/or corrected for representation pursuant to document 26 filed 9/11/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 16, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John M Devaney on behalf of Plaintiffs Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 16, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Response to #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(GMP)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting the #41 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. The Secretary may file a combined and consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief not to exceed 27 pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to file the lodged Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Emergency Motion with attachments (Doc. 42). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/16/20. (GMP)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The Court has received inquiries from the public who wish to listen to the September 22, 2020 hearing. Members of public or of the media seeking access are directed to email AZD-PIO@azd.uscourts.gov to obtain dialing instructions. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/16/2020. (REK)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Arizona Advocacy Network's Motion to Intervene #26 is DENIED without prejudice. Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Maricopa County Republican Committee, and Yuma County Republican Committee's Motion to Intervene #12 is DENIED without prejudice. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference with the parties regarding the September 22, 2020 hearing on Friday, September 18, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mountain Standard Time (Pacific Daylight Time) to discuss Daubert Motions and how to proceed with the hearing. Plaintiffs' counsel shall set up a call-in number on or before Noon on Thursday, September 17, 2020 and disseminate it to all parties, including the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting an expedited briefing schedule. Defendant's Daubert Motion shall be filed no later than Friday, September 18, 2020. Responses to Defendant's Daubert Motion shall be filed no later than Monday, September 21, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/16/2020. (REK)
September 15, 2020 Filing 44 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2020 re Motion to Intervene #12 . Argument presented. The Court takes the motion under advisement. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Chris McClure for Plaintiffs. Roopali Desai and Marty Harper for Defendant. Sarah Gonski and John Devaney for Proposed Intervenor Plaintiff Arizona Advocacy Network. Brett Johnson and Eric Spencer for Proposed Intervenor Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:09 AM to 11:09 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
September 15, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re: #26 MOTION to Intervene as Intervenor-Plaintiff filed by Katie Hobbs. (Desai, Roopali)
September 14, 2020 Filing 42 *(Filed at doc. #48 )- LODGED Proposed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive and Declaratory Relief re: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Combined Motion to Dismiss and Response to Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive and Declaratory Relief . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Desai, Roopali) Modified on 9/16/2020 (GMP).
September 14, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Combined Motion to Dismiss and Response to Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Roopali)
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Maricopa County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Johnson, Brett)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Intervene as Intervenor-Plaintiff filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (McClure, Chris)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Maricopa County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett)
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE re: Hearings by Arizona Advocacy Network . (Gonski, Sarah)
September 14, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #28 Notice (Other) filed by Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Arizona Republican Party, Yuma County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Coconino County Republican Committee, Maricopa County Republican Committee, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Derek Flint but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Eric Spencer. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: In light of General Order 20-17, the hearing currently set for September 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. shall be conducted telephonically by all parties. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for Proposed Intervenor-Defendants shall set up a call-in number on or before 5:00 p.m. on September 14, 2020, and disseminate the number to all parties, including the Court. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/20. (GMP)
September 14, 2020 Filing 34 REQUEST re: telephonic hearing by Movants Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Maricopa County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett)
September 14, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE re: Oral Argument and Hearing by Katie Hobbs re: #24 Order on Motion for Hearing on Motion, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Desai, Roopali)
September 14, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene Amended filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Healy)(McClure, Chris)
September 13, 2020 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Katie Hobbs on 9/2/20. (McClure, Chris)
September 13, 2020 Filing 30 *Amended by #32 -- RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and Certificate of Service filed by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Healy)(McClure, Chris) *Modified on 9/14/2020 (WLP).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re: #26 Motion to Intervene as Intervenor-Plaintiff filed by Arizona Advocacy Network. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any responses to the Motion to Intervene (Doc. #26 ) are due no later than 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, 9/15/2020. Intervenor Arizona Advocacy Network is represented by Perkins Coie LLP. One of this Court's new term law clerks has accepted employ with Perkins Coie next year. That law clerk has been walled off and prevented from any knowledge or access to this case. Should the parties have any concerns about this arrangement, they should be raised with the Court immediately. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/2020. (KFZ)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE re: Regarding Hearing Logistics by Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Maricopa County Republican Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, Yuma County Republican Committee re: #24 Order on Motion for Hearing on Motion, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Spencer, Eric)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Advocacy Network. (Gonski, Sarah)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene as Intervenor-Plaintiff by Arizona Advocacy Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Complaint-in-Intervention, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonski, Sarah)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Setting a hearing on the #12 Motion to Intervene for Tuesday, September 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties will immediately inform the Court regarding whether they believe the hearing may be by video-conference or telephone, or whether it needs to be in person. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/20. (GMP)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' #9 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and setting an expedited briefing schedule as follows: The response shall be due no later than September 14, 2020. The reply shall be due no later than September 18, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' #21 Motion for Emergency Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction. The hearing is set for Tuesday, September 22, 2020 beginning at 9:00 A.M. The parties will immediately inform the Court regarding whether they believe the hearing may be by video-conference or telephone, or whether it needs to be in person. Further, the parties will immediately inform the Court whether the hearing will be evidentiary, or whether it will be argument only, as well as the time necessary for such a hearing. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/20. (GMP)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pending before the Court are the #12 Motion to Intervene filed by Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Arizona Republican Party, Coconino County Republican Committee, Maricopa County Republican committee and Yuma County Republican Committee (collectively "Intervenors") and Defendant Arizona Secretary of State's #22 Response to Motion to Intervene. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Reply is due September 14, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/20. (GMP)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Katie Hobbs. (Desai, Roopali)
September 7, 2020 Filing 21 *Emergency MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure, Chris) *Modified to remove duplicative text on 9/8/2020 (GMP).
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republican National Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Republican Congressional Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maricopa County Republican Committee.(Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer per party name standards on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coconino County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Republican Party. (Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 *MOTION to Intervene by Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated, Yuma County Republican Committee, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Maricopa County Republican Committee, Coconino County Republican Committee, Arizona Republican Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brett) *Modified to correct filer per party name standards and add additional filers on 9/4/2020 (REK).
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Leslie Begay, Caroline Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Darlene Yazzie, Donna Williams. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roopali H Desai on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Desai, Roopali)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, #2 Affidavit Of Chris McClure in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(McClure, Chris)
September 1, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Chris McClure on behalf of Plaintiffs Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet- US District Court Form JS-44 by Plaintiffs Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, Darlene Yazzie. (Novotny, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 1, 2020. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/26/20. (GMP)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Leslie Begay, Caroline Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Darlene Yazzie, Donna Williams. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Leslie Begay, Caroline Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Darlene Yazzie, Donna Williams. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Katie Hobbs. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18604308. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-8222-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Caroline Begay, Leslie Begay, Alfred McRoye, Irene Roy, Donna Williams, and Darlene Yazzie. (Novotny, Michael) (DLC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18604308 filed by Alfred McRoye, Darlene Yazzie, Irene Roy, Leslie Begay, Caroline Begay, and Donna Williams. (Novotny, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazzie et al v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred McRoye
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Yazzie
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Begay
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Begay
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Williams
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Roy
Represented By: Michael James Novotny
Represented By: Chris McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: Roopali H Desai
Represented By: David Andrew Gaona
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Yost
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Marty Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arizona Republican Party
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald J. Trump for President Incorporated
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coconino County Republican Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yuma County Republican Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arizona Advocacy Network
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: John M Devaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Republican Congressional Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maricopa County Republican Committee
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?