Sachs et al v. Norcold Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sachs and Richard Sachs
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Norcold Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv08052
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Stipulation to Stay Deadline: The stayin this matter is stayed until 5/17/21. No further days or continuances will be granted. The parties shall move for joinder of the additional matter by May 17 or the Court will remand the extant matter for failure to meet jurisdictional requirements. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/3/21. (DXD)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Stay Deadlines to Join Related Action by Norcold Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Obert, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Norcold Incorporated.(Obert, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting is the Parties' Stipulation to Stay Deadlines to Join, Answer, or Request a Remand (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for filing an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. 1-2) to April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/20/2021. (JAMA)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #10 Stipulation to Stay Deadlines to Join, Answer, or Request a Remand - Proposed Order by Defendant Norcold Incorporated. (Lindsey, Barrett)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO STAY DEADLINES TO JOIN, ANSWER, OR REQUEST A REMAND by Norcold Incorporated. (Lindsey, Barrett)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Counsel for the Plaintiff(s) shall apply for Entry of Default or file a Status Report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/15/21. (DXD)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss or motion to strike to determine whether it can be avoided. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/15/2021. (CLB)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Norcold, Inc.'s Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Norcold Incorporated. (SCA)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Norcold Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Norcold Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19249883. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08052-PCT-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yavapi County Superior Court, case number P1300CV202100127. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19249883 filed by Norcold Incorporated.(Obert, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(SCA)
March 12, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Notice of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Norcold Inocorporated on 02/12/2021. (Original filed in Yavapai County Superior Court on 02/16/2021) (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sachs et al v. Norcold Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sachs
Represented By: Mark Anthony Kille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sachs
Represented By: Mark Anthony Kille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold Incorporated
Represented By: Barrett Neal Lindsey
Represented By: Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?