Ashcroft v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Loni Dee Ashcroft
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv08115
Filed: May 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached order for deadlines and details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/25/2021. (KFZ)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/20/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/25/2021. (KFZ)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/25/2021. (KFZ)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08115-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Loni Dee Ashcroft. (REK)
May 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Loni Dee Ashcroft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6, #7 Exhibit Part 7, #8 Exhibit Part 8)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashcroft v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loni Dee Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?