Electra v. Dream River Incorporated
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra and Tara Leigh Patrick
Defendant: Dream River Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Defendant Dream Girls Gentlemen's Club
Case Number: 3:2021cv08134
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #14 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (MFR)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 08:45 AM before Judge Susan M Brnovich. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/05/2021. (REK)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dream River Incorporated.(Mear, Richard)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 *NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal filed by Amy Marie Hoffman terminating DeeAnn Marie Barnes. (Hoffman, Amy) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 7/13/2021 (SST).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #11 Stipulation For Extension of Time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and including 8/06/2021 Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/29/2021. (ESG)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Dream River Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mear, Richard)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Carmen Electra: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon Steve Beasley for Dream River on 06-19-2021. (Barnes, DeeAnn)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Carmen Electra. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Casas, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John V Golaszewski, Joseph N Casas on behalf of Plaintiff Carmen Electra. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/11/2021. (ESG)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/11/2021. (ESG)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/11/2021. (ESG)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dream River Incorporated. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19559838. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8134-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Carmen Electra. (Hoffman, Amy) (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19559838 filed by Carmen Electra. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electra v. Dream River Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: DeeAnn Marie Barnes
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream River Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Defendant Dream Girls Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: Benjamin John Branson
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?