Thorn v. Schulze et al
Plaintiff: Roxanne Thorn
Defendant: Walther Schulze, Alexander Dorst, HMR Services and Equipment LLC, Baba Investments LLC, Brody Financial LLC and Miracle Trust
Case Number: 3:2021cv08150
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than September 22, 2021 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/25/21. (MAW)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by HMR Services and Equipment LLC identifying Other Affiliate Baba, Inv. LLC for HMR Services and Equipment LLC. (Lomax, John) *Modified to correct corporate party per party name standards on 8/25/2021 (REK).
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brody Financial LLC identifying Other Affiliate Miracle Trust for Brody Financial LLC. (Lomax, John) *Modified corporate party per party name standards on 8/25/2021 (REK).
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baba Investments LLC identifying Other Affiliate Brody Financial LLC for Baba Investments LLC. (Lomax, John) *Modified corporate party per party name standards on 8/25/2021 (REK).
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Baba Investments LLC, Brody Financial LLC, HMR Services and Equipment LLC.(Lomax, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 *NOTICE re: SERVICE of PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roxanne Thorn . (Bihn, Martin) *Modified on 8/11/2021 to correct event type (KAH).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that HMR Services and Equipment, LLC, Baba Investments, LLC, and Brody Financial, LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #10 ) is granted. The deadline for these defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to August 24, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/30/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Baba Investments LLC, Brody Financial LLC, HMR Services and Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lomax, John)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roxanne Thorn: Return of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon HMR Services and Equipment, LLC on July 13, 2021. (Bihn, Martin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roxanne Thorn: Return of Service re: summons & Complaint upon Brody Financial, LLC on July 13, 2021. (Bihn, Martin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roxanne Thorn: Return of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Baba Inv, LLC on July 13, 2021. (Bihn, Martin)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Court's Preliminary Order on HMR, LLC; Baba LLC; and Brody Financial, LLC by Roxanne Thorn . (Bihn, Martin)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 7, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/13/21. (MAW)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baba Investments LLC, Brody Financial LLC, Alexander Dorst, HMR Services and Equipment LLC, Miracle Trust, and Walther Schulze. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19648515. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8150-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Roxanne Thorn. (Bihn, Martin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(DLC)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19648515 filed by Roxanne Thorn. (Bihn, Martin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorn v. Schulze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Thorn
Represented By: Donna Marie McDaniel
Represented By: Martin Andrew Bihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walther Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Dorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMR Services and Equipment LLC
Represented By: Jessica Alice Van Ranken
Represented By: John F Lomax, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baba Investments LLC
Represented By: Jessica Alice Van Ranken
Represented By: John F Lomax, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody Financial LLC
Represented By: Jessica Alice Van Ranken
Represented By: John F Lomax, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?