Amaya v. Future Motion Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Juan Amaya
Defendant: Future Motion Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2021cv08243
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott M Rusert on behalf of Defendant Future Motion Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Future Motion Incorporated. (Hunter, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T Liburdi. The parties must jointly filethe Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 daysbefore the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 11/2/21. (SJF)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Future Motion Incorporated.(Hunter, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Future Motion Incorporated. (SCA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Future Motion Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20015324. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08243-PCT-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S0300CV202100521. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20015324 filed by Future Motion Incorporated. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaya v. Future Motion Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Amaya
Represented By: Daniel Craig Kaapke
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Motion Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hunter
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Scott M Rusert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?