Davis v. Voorhees et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Davis
Defendant: Rhondie Voorhees, Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University Board of Trustees, Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University and Tyler Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv08249
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tyler Smith.(Gautreaux, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a Status Report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of its case against Defendant Tyler Smith. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant Tyler Smith if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/29/21. (DXD)
December 28, 2021 Filing 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Certification of Costs by Counter Defendant Audrey Davis, Plaintiff Audrey Davis. (Randazza, Marc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 20 **Correct at Doc #21 ** Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Certification of Costs by Counter Defendant Audrey Davis, Plaintiff Audrey Davis. (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 12/29/2021 (DXD).
December 28, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Audrey Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Keila Szpaller, Transgender student drops out, alleges discrimination at Missoula College, BILLINGS GAZETTE (Aug. 9, 2015), #2 Exhibit 2 - Keila Szpaller, University of Montana Dean of Students asked to leave, MISSOULIAN (Aug. 20, 2018), #3 Exhibit 3 - Meet the Dean of Students Page on ERAU website, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint in Cole v. Montana University System, Case No. CV-21-88-M-BMM (D. Mont.))(Randazza, Marc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #17 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Proposed Order) by Counter Defendant Audrey Davis, Plaintiff Audrey Davis. (Randazza, Marc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 17 *MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Counterclaim by Audrey Davis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc Randazza, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email from Patrick Davis to Dan Warner, #3 Exhibit 2 - Application for Entry of Default, #4 Exhibit 3 - Motion to Deem Clerks Default Void or in the Alternative, to Set it Aside, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Rule 7.1(f) Motion to Strike Defendant Audrey Daviss Supplement in Support of Motion to Continue, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs Rule 7.1(f) Motion to Strike Defendants Motion to Deem Clerks Default Void or in the Alternative, to Set It Aside, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Rule 7.1(f) Motion to Strike Defendant Audrey Daviss Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs Rule 7.1(f) Motion to Strike Defendant Audrey Daviss Supplement in Support of Motion to Continue, #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice, #10 Exhibit 9 - State Court Complaint, #11 Exhibit 10 - Response to Motion to Continue, #12 Exhibit 11 - Randazza Legal Group and Audrey Davis Fee Agreement, #13 Exhibit 12 - Attorney Time Entries and Hours Worked, #14 Exhibit 13 - Fee Summary, #15 Exhibit 14 - Curriculum Vitae of Marc Randazza, #16 Exhibit 15 - Laffey Matrix, #17 Exhibit 16 - iQTAXX, LLC v. Boling No. A-15-728426-C, 2016 BL 154334 (Nev. Dist. Ct. May 10, 2016), #18 Exhibit 17 - Judgment Granting Fee Motion Guo v. Cheng No. A-18-779172-C (Nev. Dist. Ct. Jun. 4, 2020)) (Randazza, Marc). *Modified to add motion on 12/29/2021 (DXD).
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University, Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University Board of Trustees. (Woodard, Joshua)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University, Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University Board of Trustees.(Woodard, Joshua)
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Audrey Davis: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Rhondie Voorhees on 11/16/2021. (Randazza, Marc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Audrey Davis: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon ERAUs' Service of Process Coordinator, Brooklyn Vandeventer on 11/18/2021. (Randazza, Marc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Audrey Davis: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon ERAU Board of Trustees' Service of Process Coordinator, Brooklyn Vandeventer on 11/18/2021. (Randazza, Marc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Audrey Davis: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Tyler Smith on 12/02/2021. (Randazza, Marc)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2022 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/7/2021. (RMV)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand -Rhondie Voorhees's Answer and, COUNTERCLAIM against Audrey Davis by Rhondie Voorhees. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rhondie Voorhees, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Warner, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 *Document filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 11/15/2021 (SCH).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/12/2021. (RMV)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Audrey Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Randazza, Marc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Audrey Davis. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University, Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University Board of Trustees, Tyler Smith, Rhondie Voorhees. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20060150. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8249-PCT-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Audrey Davis. (Randazza, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20060150 filed by Audrey Davis. (Randazza, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Voorhees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Davis
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhondie Voorhees
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Daniel Robert Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University Board of Trustees
Represented By: Audrey Elaine Chastain
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embry-Riddle Aeronautical University
Represented By: Audrey Elaine Chastain
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Drew Gautreaux
Represented By: Mark W Drutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?