Parsons v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donald Samuel Parsons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv08033
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Donald Samuel Parsons: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (4/5/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (3/31/2022); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (3/31/2022) on 4/5/2022; 3/31/2022; 3/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fern, Sarah)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Cheung appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Cheung, Allison)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the #2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. The parties must fully comply with the following deadlines: Opening Brief due within 60 days after the answer is filed; Answering Brief due within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief; Reply Brief due within 15 days after service of Defendant's brief. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/1/2022. (ESG)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-08033-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Donald Samuel Parsons. (Fern, Sarah) (BAC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 *SUMMONS Submitted by Donald Samuel Parsons. (Fern, Sarah) (BAC) *Modified to reflect incorrect PDF attached on 2/25/2022. Correctly filed at Doc. #4 (BAC).
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donald Samuel Parsons. (Fern, Sarah) (BAC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Donald Samuel Parsons. (Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Samuel Parsons
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?