Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated v. Razaghi Development Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated doing business as Sage Memorial Hospital and Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated an Arizona non-profit corporation doing business as Sage Memorial Hospital
Defendant: Razaghi Development Company LLC doing business as Razaghi Healthcare and Unknown Parties
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ahmad R Razaghi, Tausif Hasan and Razaghi Development Company LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, Stephen Hoffman and Unknown Hoffman
Counter Defendant: Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2023cv08072
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/14/2023. As set forth on the record, IT IS ORDERED that within 7 days of the issuance of this Order the parties shall supplement their Joint Case Management Report (Doc. #300 ) with (1) a proposed plan for handling electronically stored information; and (2) a proposed protective order with respect to privileged materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the transfer from the United States District Court of Nevada, the Court will permit the parties to renew their motions as previously filed at (Docs. #235 ; #246 ; #253 ). The parties shall do so within 14 days of the issuance of this Order and in compliance with this Court's Local Rules. APPEARANCES: Dale Coffman and Amanda Newman for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant. Kristina Leonhardt, Pavneet Uppal and Lori Guner for Defendants Hasan, Razaghi and Defendant/Counter Claimant Razaghi Development Company LLC. Michael Zoldan for Third Party Defendants Dalgai and El-Meligi. Michael Obert Jr for Third Party Defendants Hoffman and Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 3:00 PM to 3:40 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated. (Newman, Amanda)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #296 Motion to Substitute Attorney. James Burr Shields and Michael D. Zoldan are substituted as counsel for Third Party Defendants in place of Kathleen Bliss, Paul S. Padda, David J. Stander, and Douglass A. Mitchell. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/17/23. (DXD)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 AMENDED ANSWER to #192 Amended Complaint, #291 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company LLC, Razaghi Development Company LLC(CC per Doc 67, 92, 217), Razaghi Development Company LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company LLC, Razaghi Development Company LLC(CC per Doc 67, 92, 217), Razaghi Development Company LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leonhardt, Kristina)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joel Z Schwarz on behalf of Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, Counter Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 *MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent to Substitution of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Shields, James) *Modified from notice to motion on 5/11/2023 (DXD).
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #294 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 83.3(b) Appearance by Attorney. Please note: No Attorney shall be permitted to withdraw/substitute except by formal written order of the Court. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: James Burr Shields appearing for Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi. . (Shields, James)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/14/2023 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/27/2023. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Obert, Jr on behalf of Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Obert, Michael)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ANSWER to #192 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Stephen Hoffman, Unknown Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated by Ahmad R Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company LLC, Tausif Hasan.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Dale Samuel Coffman. (Coffman, Dale)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 PRELIMINARY ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/19/2023. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation to Set and/or Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #287 ). Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #287 ) is granted. Defendants shall have up to and including April 25, 2023, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #192 ). ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/19/2023. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #192 Amended Complaint by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R Razaghi, Ahmad R Razaghi(217 Counterclaim), Razaghi Development Company LLC, Razaghi Development Company LLC(217 Third Party Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonhardt, Kristina)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt. (Leonhardt, Kristina)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by James Burr Shields, II on behalf of Netrisha Dalgai(217 - Third Party Complaint), Christi El-Meligi. (Shields, James)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE Re Transfer of 2:19-cv-00329-GMN (EJY) from the District of Nevada as to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-23-8072-PCT-DJH. (MAP)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-00329 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/2023. Pending before the Court is the #245 Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Arizona, filed by Defendants Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Ahmad R. Razaghi, and Tausif Hasan. Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. filed the #251 Notice of Non-Opposition, and Third-Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai and Christi El-Meligi filed the #271 Notice of Non-Opposition.Federal courts may transfer any civil action "[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interests of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). A motion to transfer lies within the broad discretion of the district court, and is determined on an "individualized, case-by-case consideration of convenience and fairness." Stewart Org., Inc. v. Ricoh Corp., 487 U.S. 22, 29 (1988). Here, no party opposes the transfer of venue to the District of Arizona, and the District of Arizona appears to be a more convenient venue because the relevant agreements were negotiated and executed in Arizona, Arizona law applies, and a majority of witnesses live in Arizona. (Mot. Change Venue 9:114:5, ECF No. #245 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #245 Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #235 Motion to Dismiss, #276 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #253 Motion for Reconsideration, and #246 Motion to Stay Discovery are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that following transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court shall close the case in this district. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER Granting #280 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. Tausif Hasan answer due 4/14/2023; Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 4/14/2023; Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 4/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #192 Amended Complaint by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 REPLY to Response to #246 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REPLY to Response to #235 Motion to Dismiss by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 DECLARATION of Joel Z. Schwarz re #276 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP.. (Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Responses due by 4/10/2023. (Schwarz, Joel) (dispositive) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Granting #274 Stipulation for extension of time to file reply in support of #235 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/27/2023. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply in Support re #235 Motion to Dismiss by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Schwarz, Joel) (extend) (sumjgm) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 RESPONSE to #246 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 3/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Granting #261 Motion to Extend Time to respond to #245 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer. IT IS SO ORDERED, Nunc pro tunc, that Third Party Defendants shall have until March 21, 2023, to file their response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NON-OPPOSITION to #245 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REPLY to Response to #253 Motion for Reconsideration, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Bustos, Justin) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney D. Samuel Coffman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/20/2023. Pending before the Court is the #263 Motion to Extend Time to File Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. The Court has granted Petitioner D. Samuel Coffman's petition to practice pro hac vice. (Order, ECF No. #267 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #263 Motion is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #265 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for D. Samuel Coffman and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Justin J. Bustos. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE to #235 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 3/24/2023. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by D. SAMUEL COFFMAN and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel JUSTIN J. BUSTOS (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7239376) by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Bustos, Justin) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 RESPONSE to #253 Motion for Reconsideration, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 3/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A and B)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) To File Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in This Case Only re 252 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit 2)(Bustos, Justin) (presiding) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE to #261 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 3/17/2023. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #260 Order on Stipulation,,, by ThirdParty Defendant Christi El-Meligi. Responses due by 3/23/2023. (Bliss, Kathleen) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #259 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to #246 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery. Responses due by 3/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #246 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (extend) (nondispositive) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/7/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is Razaghi Development Company, LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP's Motion to Stay Discovery Regarding Third-Party Complaint During Pendency of Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #235 ) and Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. #245 ). ECF No. #256 . The Court notes a Corrected Image of Defendant's Motion to Extend Time was filed at ECF No. #257 .Upon review of the Motion to Extend Time, the Court finds the meet and confer efforts regarding the underlying issue, the deadline for Razaghi Development Company, LLC to respond to the pending Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. #246 ), was conducted through email only. This fails to comply, and therefore fails to establish, an appropriate meet and confer was conducted in accordance with United States District Court for the District of Nevada Local Rule IA 1-3(f). Local Rule IA 1-3(f) states: "Whenever used in these rules, to 'meet and confer' means to communicate directly and discuss in good faith the issues required under the particular rule or court order. This requirement is reciprocal and applies to all participants. Unless these rules or a court order provide otherwise, this requirement may only be satisfied through direct dialogue and discussion in a face-to-face meeting, telephone conference, or video conference. The exchange of written, electronic, or voice-mail communications does not satisfy this requirement." (Emphasis added.)Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Razaghi Development Company, LLC's Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. #256 ) is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Razaghi Development Company may refile its Motion to Extend Time if necessary after concluding sincere meet and confer efforts, which must be documented through a supporting declaration. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #256 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) (Expedited Ruling Requested) re #246 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2023. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (nondispositive) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/3/2023. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Pending before the Court in the Joint Proposed Updated Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Relating to Claims, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Claims (ECF No. #254 ). The Stipulation is granted; provided, however, the Court recognizes a Motion to Stay Discovery pertaining to the Second Amended Third Party Complaint (ECF No. #246 ) remains pending. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Proposed Updated Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Relating to Claims, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Claims (ECF No. #254 ) is GRANTED without prejudice to a future decision on the pending Motion to Stay Discovery at ECF No. #246 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 197 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,,,,,,,,, Order for Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order,,,,,,,,, by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC.. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for Reconsideration Motion for Relief From Orders re #232 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #178 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2023. (Bustos, Justin) (DJorder) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel D. Samuel Coffman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/10/2023. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NON-OPPOSITION to #245 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Bustos, Justin) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Granting #248 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Responses re #245 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer due by 3/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Substitute Attorneys. Attorneys Paul S. Padda; David Joel Stander; Kathleen Bliss and Douglass A. Mitchell terminated as to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #245 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi. (Padda, Paul) (extend) (nondispositive) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Justin J. Bustos in for Attorney Kathleen Bliss by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 3/9/2023. (Bustos, Justin) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Responses due by 3/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION to Change Venue or Transfer. Responses due by 2/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Granting #242 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. Tausif Hasan answer due 3/31/2023; Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 3/31/2023; Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Granting #241 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to #235 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #192 Amended Complaint by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #235 Motion to Dismiss by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (extend) (sumjgm) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/8/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is a Motion to Remove Counsel Jeffrey Winchester. ECF No. #239 . Counsel for Defendants seeks to remove Jeffrey Winchester as counsel of record for Defendant, Counterclaimant, and Third-Party Plaintiff Razaghi Development Company, LLC and for Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi and Tausif Hasan so that Mr. Winchester no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case. Id. at 2. Counsel for Defendants states Mr. Winchester is no longer associated with the firm Fisher & Phillips, LLP. Id.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Remove Counsel Jeffrey Winchester (ECF No. #239 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must remove Jeffrey Winchester's name from CM/ECF as counsel for Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi and Tausif Hasan so that he no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allison Kheel must be added to the docket as counsel for Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi and Tausif Hasan. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP)[Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to remove attorney Jeffrey D. Winchester from the Electronic Service List in this case by Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison List Kheel on behalf of Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/8/2023. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Before the Court is the Substitution of Attorney filed by counsel for Razaghi Development Company, LLC. ECF No. #236 . This document is inadequate for the purpose it was filed. That is, it appears counsel for Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC does not seek to a substitution of counsel, but to enter a notice of appearance for Allison Kheel of Fisher Phillips LLP and remove Jeffrey Winchester of the same firm from CM/ECF notifications because he is no longer associated with Fisher Phillips LLP. Thus, a notice of appearance and motion to remove counsel from the service list should have been filed rather than a substitution of counsel. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. #236 ) is DENIED as improperly filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must remove Jeffrey Winchester's name from CM/ECF as counsel for Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC so that he no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case for Razaghi Development Company, LLC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allison Kheel must be added to the docket as counsel for Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if counsel for Defendants wish to have Mr. Winchester removed from service for other defendants and wishes to have Ms. Kheel's appearance entered on their behalf, then Defendants must file the appropriate request with the Court to do so. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Allison L. Kheel in for Attorney Jeffrey D. Winchester by Counter Claimant Ahmad R. Razaghi, ThirdParty Plaintiff Ahmad R. Razaghi, Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (List Kheel, Allison) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION to Dismiss #192 Amended Complaint by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Responses due by 2/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen D. Hoffman)(Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/31/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Alanna Brook As Counsel of Record in This Case. ECF No. #233 . Defendants' counsel seeks to remove attorney Alanna Brook from the list of counsel for Defendants and from the electronic service system as she "ended her association with Fisher Phillips LLP in 2021...[and] is no longer associated with this litigation." Id. at 2. The firm Fisher Phillips LLP will continue to represent Defendants. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Alanna Brook As Counsel of Record in This Case (ECF No. #233 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will remove Alanna Brook's name from CM/ECF and the docket so that she no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alanna Brook for Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2023. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #201 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/18/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is Third-Party Defendants Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP and Stephen D. Hoffman's Request for Leave to Withdraw Attorney Marc S. Cwik. ECF No. #230 . Joel Z. Schwarz of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP shall continue to represent Third-Party Defendants. Id. at 2. Thus, Third-Party Defendants' Motion is not to withdraw, but to remove Marc S. Cwik from the electronic service system as he is no longer representing Third-Party Defendants. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Third-Party Defendants Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP and Stephen D. Hoffman's Request for Leave to Withdraw Attorney Marc. S. Cwik (ECF No. #230 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall remove Marc S. Cwik's name from CM/ECF and the docket such that he no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joel Z. Schwarz in for Attorney Marc S. Cwik by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Responses due by 2/1/2023. (Schwarz, Joel) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen Bliss. (Bliss, Kathleen) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER Granting #227 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request). Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP answer re #217 Third Party Complaint due 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond re #217 Third Party Complaint,,, by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Cwik, Marc) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Christi El-Meligi and Netrisha Dalgai's ANSWER to #217 Third Party Complaint,,, filed by Netrisha Dalgai(217 - Third Party Complaint), Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi(217 - Third Party Complaint).(Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Granting #224 Stipulation to extend time to respond to counterclaims and Second Amended Third-Party Claims. Netrisha Dalgai answer due 1/11/2023; Christi El-Meligi answer due 1/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #217 Third Party Complaint,,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi. (Padda, Paul) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Granting #222 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to third party-complaint. Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP answer due 1/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #217 Third Party Complaint,,, by Third Party Defendants Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (Cwik, Marc) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting #219 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. Netrisha Dalgai answer due 12/30/2022; Christi El-Meligi answer due 12/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 AMENDED ANSWER to #217 Complaint with Jury Demand , and COUNTERCLAIM against Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.(217 Counterclaim). filed by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.(217 Counterclaim).(Bliss, Kathleen) Modified on 12/14/2022 try and clarify the entry. (WJ). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by ThirdParty Defendant Christi El-Meligi. (Bliss, Kathleen) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Netrisha Dalgai(217 - Third Party Complaint), Christi El-Meligi, Jane Doe Hoffman, Stephen Hoffman, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. (LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT /Defendant RDC's Counterclaims and Second Amended Third-Party Claims against Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, Stephen Hoffman, Jane Doe Hoffman by Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons El-Meligi, #4 Summons Dalgai, #5 Summons Stephen D. Hoffman, #6 Summons Jane Doe Hoffman, #7 Summons Lewis Brisbois) (Leonhardt, Kristina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Granting #215 Motion to Amend answer to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION to Amend #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 11/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Leonhardt, Kristina) (pleading) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #213 Notice (Other). Attorney Nermana Grinnan advised to review your document and make the necessary updates to your CMECF account. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 10/31/2022 COMPLIED (WJ). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE [Nermana Grinnan] by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC.. (Pehlic, Nermana) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPLY to Response to #201 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Accepting and Adopting Report and Recommendations re #210 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendants Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. #174 ) be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs request for sanctions argued in ECF No. #183 be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting #208 Motion to Extend Time to file reply to #201 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/21/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Reply ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #207 Response, by Counter Claimants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 10/6/2022. (Pehlic, Nermana) (sumjgm) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE to #201 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 9/26/2022. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting #205 Stipulation for Extension of time to respond to #201 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/19/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #201 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) (extend) (sumjgm) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting #203 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) for Plaintiff to Respond to #201 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #201 Motion to Dismiss by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) (extend) (sumjgm) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Counter and Third-Party Claims by Razaghi Development Company, LLC re #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,.. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION to Dismiss #192 Amended Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Granting #199 Stipulation for Defendants to answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Tausif Hasan answer due 8/19/2022. Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 8/19/2022. Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #192 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPLY to Response to #174 Motion,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/21/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Pending before the Court is the Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. ECF No. 196. The parties agree on the content of the proposed plan and schedule with the exception of whether (1) the submission of the proposed plan and schedule somehow impedes the parties' right to submit a subsequent motion to stay discovery, and (2) there should be any limitation on discovery.The Court has considered the proposed plan and schedule and HEREBY ORDERS that the Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 196) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that:1. The discovery cut-off date is June 9, 2023; any amendment to the pleadings or to add parties must be filed no later than January 9, 2023; the initial expert disclosures deadline is April 7, 2023; the rebuttal expert disclosures deadline is May 9, 2023; the deadline for filing dispositive motions is August 11, 2023; and the proposed joint pre-trial order is due September 8, 2023; provided, however, that if a dispositive motion is pending on the due date for the joint pre-trial order, that due date is automatically extended to 60 days after the Court issues a decision on such motion.2. The filing of this Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order does not impede the rights of the parties to file motions as each may deem appropriate under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, case law, statute or regulation that may apply to a future dispute; provided, however, the parties agree that before filing a motion to compel discovery or for protective order related to discovery (or any similarly titled discovery motion), the parties will engage in good faith meet and confer efforts and then contact the Court for purposes of resolving any issue that remain outstanding.3. The scope and breadth of discovery shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and case law interpreting the same. The parties may seek an order of the Court to alter any limitations on discovery established by the Rules through stipulations or joint motions. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #192 Amended Complaint by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting #194 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including July 22, 2022 to respond to or otherwise answer the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. #192 ). Defendants shall have up to and including June 24, 2022 to submit their reply in support of Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (ECF No. #174 ). Tausif Hasan answer due 7/22/2022. Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 7/22/2022. Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 7/22/2022. Replies due by 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/2/2022. Tausif Hasan answer due 7/22/2022. Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 7/22/2022. Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 7/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #174 Motion,, #192 Amended Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Clarification by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. re #183 Response,,,. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint and to File Reply re #174 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/20/2022. Replies due by 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Stipulation To Extend Plaintiff's Time To File Amended Complaint And For Defendants To File Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' #174 Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions. Replies due by 5/31/2022. Amended complaint due by 05/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #187 Order on Stipulation,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #186 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Reply to #174 Motion and File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/29/2022. Replies due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #183 Response,,, #178 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Denying as moot and without Prejudice #170 Motion to Stay Discovery. ORDER Granting #184 Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery (Defendants' Motion to Stay) re #170 Motion to Stay Discovery,, by Defendant Ahmad R. Razaghi. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RESPONSE to #174 Motion,, by Counter Defendant Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 4/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28) (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Granting #181 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to #170 Motion to Stay and #174 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Responses due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #174 Motion,, #170 Motion to Stay Discovery,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Granting #179 Stipulation for Extend Time Re: #170 Motion to Stay Discovery, #174 Motion. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #174 Motion,, #173 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,, #170 Motion to Stay Discovery,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #147 Motion to Dismiss. Sage shall have twenty-one (21) days from entry of this Order to file an Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies identified by this Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Stipulation Re: #170 Motion to Stay Discovery and #174 Motion for sanctions. Responses due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #174 Motion,, #170 Motion to Stay Discovery,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Ahmad R. Razaghi Certifying Records Pursuant to FRE 901(1) & 902(11) by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC re #174 Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pehlic, Nermana) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions re #144 Amended Complaint by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6-14, #4 Exhibit 15-17, #5 Exhibit 18-19, #6 Exhibit 20-21, #7 Exhibit 22-24, #8 Exhibit 25-28) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #171 Motion to Extend Time. Case Management and Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/31/2022. See order for additional instruction and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE to #171 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) To File Case Management Report and Proposed Discovery Plan re #156 Order on Stipulation, by Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION to Stay Discovery re #156 Order on Stipulation, by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY to Response to #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Stipulation re: #147 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 2/4/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further continuances will be granted without a hearing to demonstrate a sufficient basis for further extension of deadlines. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #147 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) Modified to link to underlying motion on 1/19/2022 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting #165 Stipulation Re: #147 Motion to Dismiss; Replies due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Reply re #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) Modified to link to underlying motion on 12/9/2021 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE to #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 11/16/2021. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting #162 Stipulation Re: #147 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/9/2021. Reply shall be due 30 days after filing of Response. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro nunc pro tunc on 11/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Nermana Pehlic is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #157 Stipulation Re: #147 Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #157 Stipulation, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #157 . ERROR: Document is not in compliance with LR IA 6-2 as it states in part that the signature block must not begin on a separate page. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #157 . (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 VIEW #159 corrected image re Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery (Limited Stay). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery (Limited Stay) re #117 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,, Report and Recommendation,, by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Granting #153 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey D. Winchester in for Attorney Brian L. Bradford by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Winchester, Jeffrey) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nermana Pehlic and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Stipulation Re: #147 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 11/1/2021. Reply shall be filed 30 days after the filing of the Response. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nermana Pehlic and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6642063) by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) re #147 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE re Third Party Claims and Counterclaims by Razaghi Development Company, LLC re #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss #144 Amended Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Stipulation Re: #144 Amended Complaint, Responses due 8/23/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND re #144 Amended Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. No changes to parties. (DRS) (Main Document 144 replaced on 8/2/2021) (DRS).[Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have 14 days to respond. If Defendants elect to file a motion to dismiss, opposition shall be due 30 days after the Defendants file a motion to dismiss, reply to Sage Memorials opposition shall be due 15 days after Sage Memorial files its opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION To File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #140 Stipulation Re: #136 First Amended Complaint, Tausif Hasan answer due 7/30/2021; Ahmad R. Razaghi answer due 7/30/2021; Razaghi Development Company, LLC answer due 7/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re #137 Notice of Corrected Image/Document by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Stipulation #136 Amended Complaint, Defendant's answers due 7/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to #137 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) Modified on 6/10/2021 add link to #137(LE). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #136 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 View Corrected Image #137 as to First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. Razaghi Development Company LLC, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Tausid Hasan by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Mitchell, Douglass) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (EDS). Modified on 6/1/2021 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Stipulation; Amended Complaint deadline: 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting #132 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #131 Order (Second Request). Amended Complaint deadline: 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Stipulation to File Amended Complaint; Amended Complaint deadline: 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to file Amended Complaint re #128 Order, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul S. Padda. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Sage shall have 21 days to file an Amended Complaint. The Court further ORDERS the #47 Motion to Strike is Denied as Moot. The Court Further ADOPTS the #117 Report and Recommendation which Recommends the Court Deny without prejudice the #76 Motion for Leave to File Amended complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE to Objection to #117 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Stipulation; Plaintiff's response to Defendants' #120 , #121 Objections to Report and Recommendation due on or before March 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #124 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Stipulation to Extend time to Reply to #121 Response to #117 Order and Report and Recommendation; Replies due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #121 Objection to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE to Objection to #117 Report and Recommendation by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OBJECTION to #117 Report and Recommendation by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2021. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OBJECTION to #117 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2021. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Object to #117 Report and Recommendation; Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery /FOR OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #117 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,, Report and Recommendation,, by Counter Claimants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #56 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and/or Reconsideration. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED and the Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. Further Ordered the #72 and #110 Motions for Protective Order and the #98 Motion to Compel are Denied without prejudice as moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is Recommended that the #76 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint be Denied without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/29/2020. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.On December 11, 2020, the Court issued an Order and Report and Recommendation. ECF No. 114. By and through this Minute Order, the Court withdraws ECF No. 114. The Court will re-issue the Order and Report and Recommendation as soon as possible and, at that time, will reset the due date for objections to the same, if any. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OBJECTION to #114 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Christi El-Meligi), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Dr. Joseph Greenfield)) (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER and REPORT and RECOMENDATION The Court GRANTS the #56 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is STAYED pending the Court's resolution of the #46 Motion to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' #72 Motion for Protective Order to Limit Subpoenas Served by Plaintiff, #98 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Defendants' #110 Motion for Protective Order are DENIED without prejudice as moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the #76 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY to Response to #110 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibit and Exhibit A) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE to #110 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Douglass A. Mitchell, #3 Exhibit 2 - Transcript - Allstate v Shah, #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript - Allstate v Belsky) (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying the Emergency portion of the #110 Motion for Protective Order and Setting a Briefing Schedule. The Motion shall be heard in ordinary course. Responses are due by 12/1/2020. Reply shall be due seven court days after Plaintiff's response is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the due date of Plaintiff's second non-party subpoena directed to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is temporarily STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (JM). Modified text at request of chambers and regenerated NEF to advise #110 is still pending and before the Court. on 11/19/2020 (DRS). Modified on 11/19/2020 (DRS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits and Exhibits) (Leonhardt, Kristina) Modified on 1/15/2021 (DRS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/29/2021. Motions due by 7/29/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) Discovery Period And All Related Deadlines re #54 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY to Response to #98 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to #98 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #102 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alanna Brook and approving Brian L. Bradfor as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Stipulation For Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's #98 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery For Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's re #98 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alanna Brook and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6206968) by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc..(Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Respond/Answer #92 Third Party Complaint and Counterclaim. Answers are now due on or before 10/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Douglass Mitchell, #3 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment to CEO Services Contract, #4 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment to CEO Services Contract, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sage Memorial First Document Request, #6 Exhibit 5 - Razaghi Healthcare Response to First Document Request, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Christi El-Meligi, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Netrisha Dalgai) (Mitchell, Douglass) Modified on 1/15/2021 (DRS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond/Answer; Re: #92 Third Party Complaint/Counterclaim. Answers now due 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to #76 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Bliss, Kathleen) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer Re: #92 Answer, Third Party Complaint and Counterclaim. Netrisha Dalgai answer due 9/25/2020; Christi El-Meligi answer due 9/25/2020; Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. answer due 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #92 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendants Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc., Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Christi El-Meligi, Netrisha Dalgai by Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi., COUNTERCLAIM against Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. by Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi. filed by Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Defendants' Answer and First Amended Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit Exhibits E-H to Defendants' Answer and First Amended Counterclaims)(Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Netrisha Dalgai served on 8/3/2020; Christi El-Meligi served on 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B to Cross-Claimant's Notice) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #89 Notice. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #89 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel to refile. NOTICE Cross-Claimant's Notice of Proof of Service by Razaghi Development Company, LLC re #67 Answer to Complaint,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, #75 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Cross-Claimant's Notice) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE to #76 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #67 Third-Party and Counter Claim. Response/Answer due on 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #67 Answer to Complaint,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Third Party Defendants Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi, Counter Defendant Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to #72 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #82 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by Kathleen Bliss and Paul Padda. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to file Reply Re: #76 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Replies due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 UNOPPOSED MOTION EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A REPLY re #76 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Bliss, Kathleen) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to #76 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #46 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Strike by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendants' Response re #76 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kristina) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to #72 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - BDO Report Executive Summary, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Douglass Mitchell, #4 Exhibit C - Ariz Secretary of State Entity Report, #5 Exhibit D - Razaghi Healthcare Announcement re FCRHC, #6 Exhibit E - Collection of Invoices for Professionals Working in FCRHC, #7 Exhibit F - Collection of Time Sheets for RH Employees Working on FCRHC, #8 Exhibit G - Collection of Law Firm Summary Pages, #9 Exhibit H - Razaghi Defendants Response to First Document Request) (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Summons Issued as to Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi re #67 Third Party Complaint, Answer, Counterclaim. (DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Third Party Plaintiffs Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION For Protective Order to Limit Subpoenas Served by Plaintiff by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Counter Claimants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit) (Bradford, Brian) Modified by Clerk's Office to correct event on 7/30/2020 (EDS). Modified on 1/15/2021 (DRS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Response to #56 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Counter Claimant Tausif Hasan. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kris Leonhardt, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Exhibit 1) (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #44 VVERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kris Leonhardt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #45 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pavneet Singh Uppal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Reply to Responses to #46 Motion to Dismiss, #47 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/6/2020.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Netrisha Dalgai, Christi El-Meligi by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC., COUNTERCLAIM against Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. filed by Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit)(Bradford, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Reply re #47 Motion to Strike, #46 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE to #56 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul S. Padda) (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ERRATA to #45 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ERRATA to #44 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 7/27/2020. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE to #47 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 7/27/2020. (Bliss, Kathleen) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/14/2020. ORDER deferring ruling on #45 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel as INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 11-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case." IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel is directed to obtain the required signatures on pages 4 and 5 of the Verified Petition. Petitioner shall have until July 27, 2020, to correct the deficiencies by filing the CORRECTED Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and counsel's requirement to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/14/2020. ORDER deferring ruling on #44 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel as INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 11-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case." IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel is directed to obtain the required signatures on pages 4 and 5 of the Verified Petition. Petitioner shall have until July 27, 2020, to correct the deficiencies by filing the CORRECTED Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and counsel's requirement to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglass A. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Mitchell, Douglass) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE Of Intent To Respond To Defendants' Motion To Stay Discovery by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. re #56 Motion to Stay Discovery. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 First MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) Modified on 1/15/2021 (DRS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #53 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Motions due by 2/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #51 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Extend Time For Filing FRCP 26(f) Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Extend Time For Filing FRCP 26(f) Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #45 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #44 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to #46 Motion to Dismiss and #47 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #47 Motion to Strike, #46 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 6/19/2020. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A-D) (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 View Corrected Image #50 as to page 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pavneet Singh Uppal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6025162) by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) Modified on 6/25/2020 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kristina Leonhardt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian L. Bradford (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6025154) by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and finding as moot #22 Motion to Stay Case and #23 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Submit Their Petitions for Permission to Practice in This Case re #36 Order; Verified Petition due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Submit Their Petitions for Permission to Practice in This Case re #36 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Defendant's answers are due 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 First STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Joshua Y. Ang withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joshua Y. Ang, Esq. for Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Substitute Attorney: Attorneys Brian L Bradford, Kris Leonhardt, and Pavneet Singh Uppal for Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi,and for Razaghi Development Company, LLC substituted for Attorneys Paul C. Williams, James T. Borcia and Dennis L. Kennedy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/5/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WITHDRAWAL of #19 Motion to Dismiss, #20 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brian L. Bradford in for Attorney Bailey Kennedy LLP and Tressler LLP by Defendants Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bradford, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00329-GMN-EJY. (no image attached) (JM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to #22 Motion to Stay Case and #23 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1) (Borcia, James) Modified on 8/6/2019 to reflect correct docket entry relationship (MMM). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to #23 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #22 Motion to Stay Case, #20 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 8/2/2019. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #20 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Borcia, James) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Borcia, James) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 7/23/2019. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #25 Motion to Extend Time Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss and #22 Motion to Stay Briefing Responses to #19 Motion due by 7/16/2019. Responses to #22 Motion due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James T. Borcia and approving Attorney Paul C. Williams as Designation of Local Counsel for Ahmad Razaghi and Razaghi Development Co. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) To Respond To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings re #19 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James K. Borcia and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul C. Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5621427) by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Response re #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Case re #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Williams, Paul) Modified title of attachment on 7/1/2019 (RFJ). [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Razaghi Healthcare Invoice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amendment No. 2 to CEO Service Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Position Classification and Description, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Andrew Simpson, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Ray Ann Terry, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Declaration of Maybelle Kelewood, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Declaration of Nicole Hardy, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Declaration of Gary Pahe, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Declaration of Michael Katibak) (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James T. Borcia to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/9/2019. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul C. Williams on behalf of Defendants Tausif Hasan, Ahmad R. Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Williams, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Ahmad R. Razaghi served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Ang, Joshua) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ahmad R. Razaghi. (JM) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ahmad Razaghi by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J. Stander and approving Attorney Paul S. Padda as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/5/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc. re #7 Summons Issued, #9 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stander and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul S. Padda (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5490460) by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Razaghi Development Company, LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued To Razaghi Development Company, LLC by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued To Ahmad R. Razaghi by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Tausif Hasan by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Summons- Razaghi Development Company, LLC by Plaintiff Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney David Stander is in violation of Local Rule IA 11-1 and IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). The Court has no record of David Stander, being admitted to the U.S. District Courts bar and the attorney is not registered with CM/ECF. Attorney advised to comply with the admission requirements of this Court. Admission forms are available on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. 2. Upon complying with LR IA 11-1, you are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program 3. Please visit the Courts website, then select REGISTER FOR CM/ECF located under the attorney tab of the web page to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Padda, Paul) [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5442559) by Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Proof of service due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Padda, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 4/18/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navajo Health Foundation - Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated v. Razaghi Development Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated doing business as Sage Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Dale Samuel Coffman
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Paul S Padda
Represented By: David Joel Stander
Represented By: Douglass A Mitchell
Represented By: Joshua Y Ang
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated an Arizona non-profit corporation doing business as Sage Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Amanda Eliane Newman
Represented By: Bradley Anthony Burns
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Douglass A Mitchell
Represented By: Joshua Y Ang
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Represented By: Dale Samuel Coffman
Represented By: Kris Olin Beecher
Represented By: David Joel Stander
Represented By: Paul S Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razaghi Development Company LLC doing business as Razaghi Healthcare
Represented By: Nermana Grinnan
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Represented By: Brian L Bradford
Represented By: James T Borcia
Represented By: Jeffrey D Winchester
Represented By: Paul C Williams
Represented By: Dennis L Kennedy
Represented By: Lori Aysegul Guner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ahmad R Razaghi
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Represented By: Brian L Bradford
Represented By: Dennis L Kennedy
Represented By: James T Borcia
Represented By: Paul C Williams
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Represented By: Nermana Grinnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Tausif Hasan
Represented By: Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Represented By: Nermana Grinnan
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Represented By: Dennis L Kennedy
Represented By: James T Borcia
Represented By: Paul C Williams
Represented By: Brian L Bradford
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Razaghi Development Company LLC
Represented By: James T Borcia
Represented By: Paul C Williams
Represented By: Alanna Rebecca Brook
Represented By: Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Represented By: Dennis L Kennedy
Represented By: Nermana Grinnan
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Represented By: Allison List Kheel
Represented By: Brian L Bradford
Represented By: Lori Aysegul Guner
Represented By: Jeffrey D Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Netrisha Dalgai
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Represented By: Paul S Padda
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Michael David Zoldan
Represented By: David Joel Stander
Represented By: Douglass A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Christi El-Meligi
Represented By: Paul S Padda
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Michael David Zoldan
Represented By: David Joel Stander
Represented By: Douglass A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
Represented By: Joel Z Schwarz
Represented By: Marc C Cwik
Represented By: Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Stephen Hoffman
Represented By: Joel Z Schwarz
Represented By: Marc C Cwik
Represented By: Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unknown Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Navajo Health Foundation-Sage Memorial Hospital Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Douglass A Mitchell
Represented By: Joshua Y Ang
Represented By: Paul S Padda
Represented By: David Joel Stander
Represented By: Amanda Eliane Newman
Represented By: Bradley Anthony Burns
Represented By: Dale Samuel Coffman
Represented By: Kris Olin Beecher
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?