Yount v. Yavapai County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Alvin Ray Yount
Defendant: Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of, Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority and Arizona, State of
Case Number: 3:2023cv08526
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until 11/6/2023 to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #36 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant(s) shall file any reply within fifteen (15) days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/6/2023. (RMW)
October 6, 2023 Filing 37 STATEMENT of Conferral re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of. (Robens, Mark)
October 6, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Conferral)(Jellison, James)
September 27, 2023 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss Party State of Arizona filed by Arizona, State of. (Elliott, Stephanie)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Extend: Defendant Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority shall have until 10/20/2023 to amend its answer and file a third-party complaint pursuant to Rule 14 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/18/2023. (RMW)
September 15, 2023 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alvin Ray Yount: Proof of Service re: PRELIMINARY ORDER SPL upon All Defendants on 09/15/2023. (Yount, Alvin)
September 13, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to File an Amended Answer and Third-Party Complaint by Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Order)(Hancock, Anthony)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until October 11, 2023 to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #25 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant(s) shall file any reply within fifteen (15) days from the date Plaintiffs response is filed. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/11/23. (MJW)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/11/23. (MJW)
September 12, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #25 Motion To Dismiss by Plaintiff Alvin Ray Yount. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration In Support of Response to Motion To Dismiss)(Yount, Alvin) Modified to add link on 9/13/2023 (WLP).
September 12, 2023 Filing 28 Exhibit List by Alvin Ray Yount. (Yount, Alvin) Modified text on 9/13/2023 (WLP).
September 12, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE #20 Answer by Plaintiff Alvin Ray Yount. (Yount, Alvin) Modified text and to add link on 9/13/2023 (WLP).
September 11, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Party State of Arizona by Arizona, State of. (Elliott, Stephanie)
September 8, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-8526-PCT-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 7, 2023 Filing 23 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 6, 2023 Filing 21 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority.(Campbell, Warren)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Yavapai County and the Yavapai County Sheriff's Offices shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 10/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 9/1/2023. (KJ)
August 30, 2023 Filing 18 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
August 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Errata re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Order Extending Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Defendants Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Jellison, James)
August 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Jellison on behalf of Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of. (Jellison, James)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (doc. #14 ) is granted. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 6, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/30/23. (SMF)
August 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Order Extending Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Arizona, State of, Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority, Yavapai County Sheriff's Office, Yavapai, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Jellison, James)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alvin Ray Yount: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon State of Arizona, Attn: Kris Mayes, Arizona Attorney General on 08/21/2023. (Yount, Alvin) Modified to correct date of documents served on 8/25/2023 (WLP).
August 19, 2023 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 19, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alvin Ray Yount: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint Yavapai County AZ upon Yavapai County AZ on 08/16/2023. (Yount, Alvin)
August 19, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alvin Ray Yount: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint Central AZ Fire & Medical Authority upon Yavapai County Sheriff's Dept on 08/16/2023. (Yount, Alvin)
August 19, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alvin Ray Yount: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Yavapai County Sheriff's Dept on 08/16/2023. (Yount, Alvin)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/8/2023. (WLP)
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and mailed to plaintiff. (BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 138428. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV23-08526-PCT-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 instructions)(BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Alvin Ray Yount. (BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Alvin Ray Yount. (BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 138428 filed by Alvin Ray Yount.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yount v. Yavapai County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Ray Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Robens
Represented By: Rodney F W States
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai, County of
Represented By: James M Jellison
Represented By: Rodney F W States
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Robens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arizona Fire & Medical Authority
Represented By: Anthony J Hancock
Represented By: Warren Reed Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Stephanie Susan Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?