Smith v. Sanofi US Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gayle Smith
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Incorporated, Sanofi-Aventis US Incorporated and Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv08612
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorneys Trevor B Rockstad and Christopher J Kaufman terminated for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by C Lincoln Combs on behalf of Gayle Smith. (Combs, C)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - All action and deadlines in this matter shall be stayed until no later than 5/24/24, at which time the parties must file a status report informing the Court of the settlement status. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/18/24, at 3:30 PM is vacated. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/1/23. (DXD)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi US Services Incorporated, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings)(Fine, Cameron)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Ailes Fine on behalf of Sanofi US Services Incorporated, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Fine, Cameron)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/28/2023. (LMR)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE Re Transfer of 2:17-cv-14000 from the Eastern District of Louisiana to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-23-8612-PHX-MTL. (MAP)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-14000 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. JOINT DESIGNATION OF GENERAL AND CASE-SPECIFIC MDL RECORDS TO BE INCLUDED UPON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ratliff, Harley) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (pp) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover sheet and summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (aj) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6505838) filed by Gayle Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Trevor B. Rockstad added to party Gayle Smith(pty:pla).(Rockstad, Trevor) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/13/2017) (aj). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/13/2017) (aj). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/13/2017) (aj). [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Sanofi US Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Represented By: Madeline Averi Cordray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Represented By: Madeline Averi Cordray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Madeline Averi Cordray
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Smith
Represented By: Trevor B Rockstad
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?