McCleary et al v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Janice Louise McCleary and Andrew Scott Koontz
Defendant: Narinder B Singh, Parminder Singh, Gurjit Kaur, Amarjit Singh Sandhu, Knight Transportation, Sandhu Sehzade Incorporated, Sandhu Trans Incorporated, Parminder Singh husband doing business as Sandhu Transport, Narinder Singh and Knight Logistics LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv08056
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Knight Logistics LLC, Narinder Singh, Parminder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 15, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary. (Robbins, Joel)
May 15, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary. (Robbins, Joel)
May 15, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary. (Robbins, Joel)
May 15, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants filed by Janice Louise McCleary, Andrew Scott Koontz.(Robbins, Joel)
May 15, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (FAC Redlined Version))(Robbins, Joel)
May 9, 2024 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Sandhu Trans Inc on 04-18-2024. (Robbins, Joel)
May 9, 2024 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Narinder B. Singh on 04-19-2024. (Robbins, Joel)
May 9, 2024 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Amarjit Singh Sandhu on 04/16/2024. (Robbins, Joel)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file and serve an amended complaint properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than May 17, 2024. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order along with the amended complaint so Defendants will understand the reason for the amendment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs fail to timely file an amended complaint, the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss this case, without prejudice, for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/8/24. (SLQ)
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04-15-2024 to Sandhu Sehzade Inc . (Robbins, Joel)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04-15-2024 to Gurjit Kaur . (Robbins, Joel)
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04-15-2024 to Parminder Singh . (Robbins, Joel)
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Affidavit of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Knight Transportation on 04-15-2024. (Robbins, Joel)
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Louise McCleary: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint & Summons upon Narinder B. Singh on 04-15-2024. (Robbins, Joel)
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Narinder B Singh. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary. (Attachments: #1 Summons Narinder B. Singh)(Robbins, Joel)
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Additional Attachments to Main Document - Summons for Narinder B Singh filed by Janice Louise McCleary, Andrew Scott Koontz. The summons submitted for defendant Narinder B Singh cannot be issued because the name on the summons does not match the defendant's name. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected summons to include the full name for defendant Narinder B Singh. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. When filing the summons, go into the Civil tab, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gurjit Kaur, Knight Transportation, Amarjit Singh Sandhu, Sandhu Sehzade Incorporated, Sandhu Trans Incorporated, Parminder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Andrew Scott Koontz, Janice Louise McCleary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Narinder Singh, #3 Summons Parminder Singh, #4 Summons Gurjit Kaur, #5 Summons Amarjit Singh Sandhu, #6 Summons Knight Transporation, #7 Summons Sandhu Sehzade Inc, #8 Summons Sandhu Trans Inc)(Robbins, Joel)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Janice Louise McCleary, Andrew Scott Koontz. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22874280. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-08056-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22874280 filed by Janice Louise McCleary, Andrew Scott Koontz. (submitted by Joel Robbins) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCleary et al v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Louise McCleary
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Represented By: Keith Thomas Slack
Represented By: Lauren E Channell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Scott Koontz
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Represented By: Keith Thomas Slack
Represented By: Lauren E Channell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narinder B Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parminder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurjit Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarjit Singh Sandhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhu Sehzade Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhu Trans Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parminder Singh husband doing business as Sandhu Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?