Smith, et al v. Ryan, et al

Case Number: 4:1987cv00234
Filed: April 14, 1987
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
Presiding Judge: John M Roll
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Petitioner's Atkins-related claims are without merit. Therefore, Petitioner's Amendments to Petition for Habeas Corpus (Doc. 258 ) are denied.The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. It is FURTHER ORDERED denying a certificate of appealability on Petitioner's Atkins-related claims. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 11/29/12. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
March 22, 2012 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the parties are directed to file, within 30 days of this Order, simultaneous supplemental briefs addressing the effect, if any, of Martinez v. Ryan and Maples v. Thomas on the cause issue in this case. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/21/12. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
February 17, 2011 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 257 Motion to Amend Petition for Habeas Corpus. Within 30 days from the filing of this Order, Petitioner shall file a Supplemental Merits Brief. *see attached pdf for complete information*. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/16/11.(SMBE)
May 11, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, case on limited remand from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, re Smith's procedural default of his sentencing ineffectiveness claim; Clk Crt to forward copy to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Chief Judge John M Roll on 5/11/10. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF)
April 22, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 228 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, Clk Crt to issue writ to the Warden. Signed by Chief Judge John M Roll on 4/21/10. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF)
April 10, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 176 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Appointed Ralph E Ellinwood for Robert Douglas Smith. Signed by Chief Judge John M Roll on 4/8/09.(JEMB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, et al v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?