Salazar, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Alfonso Raymond Salazar
Respondent: Terry Stewart and Ernest Trujillo
Case Number: 4:1996cv00085
Filed: February 5, 1996
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Respondents' 299 Motion to Preclude Strickland Experts is GRANTED IN PART. The Court precludes testimony from Petitioner's Strickland experts on issues other than the relevant prevailing professional norms. Respo ndents objections to Exhibits 111, 164, 177179 and 182184 are OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' 300 Motion to Preclude Evidence of William Redondo's Reputation, Disciplinary Records, and Criminal History is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Respondents' objections to Exhibits 76 and 77 are SUSTAINED. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/10/17.(BAC)
June 19, 2017 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED Petitioner shall submit the witness interview notes in dispute to the Court, ex parte and under seal for in camera review, no later than June 23, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Petitioner shall submit to the Court, ex parte and under seal for in camera review, any drafts of the supplemental report, and any additional argument they wish to make about the question of whether the witness interview notes are a "draft report" under Rule 26(b)(4)(B). Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 6/19/2017. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
March 14, 2017 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's 246 Motion for Disclosure is DENIED. Petitioner's 247 Motion to Limit the Scope of the Expert Evaluation is DENIED. Petitioner's 48 Motion to Observe/Record the Evaluation is DENIED. If Resp ondents conclude that counsel's presence or observation via live feed would not be disruptive and consent to Petitioner's counsel's presence, counsel may be present in an observation capacity only within the parameters of any such consent. If Respondents conclude that recording the evaluation would not be disruptive and record the evaluation, a copy of the recording shall be disclosed to Petitioner. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/13/17.(BAC)
July 7, 2016 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, no later than 30 days following the filing of this Order, the parties shall each file a brief, not in excess of 17 pages, regarding the two issues set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may choose to addres s the impact of Runningeagle v. Ryan, No. 07-99026, 2016 WL 3213095 (9th Cir. June 10, 2016) on the applicability of Martinez to Petitioner's claims in their supplemental briefing. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 7/7/16.(BAC)
September 16, 2008 177 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER regarding sentencing-related claims. ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 and all amendments thereto 62 , 113 are DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment acco rdingly. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay of execution entered by this Court on 2/2/1996 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is GRANTED as to two specific issues (see attached PDF). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court forward a copy of this Order to Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. ***See attached PDF for complete information***. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/15/08. (CLJ, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfonso Raymond Salazar
Represented By: Paula K Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?