Lopez, et al v. Ryan, et al

Case Number: 4:1997cv00224
Filed: March 17, 1997
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that an evidentiary hearing to determine whether state PCR counsel was ineffective for failing to raise Claim 12-B in Petitioner's first PCR proceeding shall take place as soon as is practicable. The Court will issue a separate order setting this matter for a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 11/20/15. (KAH)
October 6, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Claims 12-A and 12-E as procedurally barred. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall each file a brief, not in excess of 17 pages, no later than November 6, 2015. The parties may file a brief in response, not in excess of 10 pages, no later than November 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/5/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
October 11, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Petitioner shall file his supplemental brief by 12/13/2012. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's supplemental brief by 2/11/2013. Petitioner shall file a reply by 3/4/2013. (see attached pdf for complete information) Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/10/2012. (GCP)
June 26, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing. Petitioner shall file his supplemental brief no later than no later than October 29, 2012. Respondents shall file a response no later than December 28, 2012. Pe titioner shall file a reply no later than January 17, 2013. It is further ORDERED that no further extensions of time to file the supplemental brief will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances with respect to this case. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/26/12. (KAH)
May 1, 2012 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief no later than 7/30/2012; Response due 9/28/2012; Reply due 10/29/2012. Clerk of Court shall reopen this case pursuant to 4/25/2012 order; Clerk of Court shall substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, as a Respondent in place of his predecesor Dora B. Schriro. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/1/12. (SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez, et al v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?