Stokley, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Richard Dale Stokley
Respondent: George Herman and Dora B. Schriro
Case Number: 4:1998cv00332
Filed: July 14, 1998
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Clerk of Court shall expeditiously return the state courtrecords received on October 30, 2000, to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court, 1501 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85007-3329.. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 10/03/12. (LMF)
April 2, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 the Motion to Unseal Ex Parte Resource Applications. The Clk of Ct shall unseal documents 21 and 91. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 4/1/09.(SGG, )
March 17, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Decision & ORDER denying 33 SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; vacating 2 ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION; granting certificate of appealability as to Claim A-1; Clk Crt to send courtesy copy of this order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of AZ Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/17/09. (KMF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokley, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Dale Stokley
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro
Represented By: Jim D Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?