Chavez, et al v. USA, et al

Plaintiff: Jose Chavez and Maria Elena Chavez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2001cv00245
Filed: May 25, 2001
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: Jacqueline J Marshall
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 266 . It is ordered, Summary judgment in favor of Defendants Rios and Scharnweber is granted and Summary judgment in favor of Defendant Hunt is denied. Summary judgment in favor of Defendant Demik is granted with respect to Defendant Demik's conduct during the March 6, 2001, stop and summary judgment is denied with respect to Defendant Demik's stop of the Chavez Shuttle on March 6, 2001. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/3/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
January 30, 2014 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 259 . Defendants' Motion to amend Answer (Doc. 232 ) is granted. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 1/30/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
September 23, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss; denying 143 Motion for Judgment; adopting re 178 Report and Recommendations.; adopting re 179 Report and Recommendations. Pretrial proceeding reamin in this case, Magistrate Judge Marshall is still in effect; case designation is CV 01-245-TUC-FRZ (JM). Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/23/10.(SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Chavez
Represented By: Ned K Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Chavez
Represented By: Ned K Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David V Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?