Jones, et al v. Schriro, et al

Case Number: 4:2003cv00478
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: O Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: O

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Authorization to represent Petitioner in State Court. By issuance of this order, the Court does not purport to encourage, approve, or convey any position with respect to the merits of the proposed litigation.. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/24/2013.(JKM)
September 24, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment 106 is dismissed as an unauthorized second or successive petition. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/23/13.(MAP)
September 6, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion To Exceed Page Limit. The Clerk of Court shall file Respondents' Response to Motion for Relief from Judgment(Doc.107).. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/6/2013.(JKM)
August 21, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court shall file Petitioner's lodged Motion for Relief from Judgment (Doc.104). Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment no later than 8/30/2013. Petitioner may file a reply no later than 9/6/2013.. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/20/2013.(JKM)
March 10, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to Petitioner's 84 Motion for New Trial is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Motion to alter or amend the judgment is denied. Motion seeking an amened Certificate of Appealability is granted to include: Whether Petitioner has established cause and prejudice to overcome the procedural default of Claim 1, which alleges various instances of prosecutorial misconduct. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 3/9/10.(MLH)
January 29, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt.27) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. The stay of execution entered by the Court on 9/22/2003 (Dkt.4) is VACATED. Certificate of Appealability Issu ed; With regards to the following issues: Whether Petitioner has establised cause to overcome the procedural default of Claim 1-A, which alleges that the prosecutor suborned perjury from detectives to bolster the credibility of Lana Irwin. The Clerk of Court forward a copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the AZ Supreme Court, 1501 W. Washington, Phoenix.. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 1/28/2010. (JKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?