Guadiana v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Petitioner: Rosemary Guadiana
Case Number: 4:2007cv00326
Filed: July 9, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 266 , 270 , and 285 . It is ordered denying 246 Defendant s Motion for Summary Judgment, 248 Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class, and 276 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Judgment. This case is deemed ready for trial. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2015 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Frank R Zapata. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 12/30/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
November 3, 2014 285 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 276 MOTION for Judgment. The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court, after its independent review of the record, enter an order DENYING the plaintiff's motion for judgment. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 11/3/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
March 13, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court enter an order denying 248 MOTION Decertify Class and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Any party may serve and file written objections within14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 3/13/2014. (BAR)
February 19, 2014 266 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court, enter an order DENYING the defendants 246 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on 10/14/13, any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served w ith a copy of this report and recommendation. If objections are not timely filed, the partys right to de novo review may be waived. The Local Rules permit the filing of a response to an objection. They do not permit the filing of a reply to a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 2/19/14.(BAC)
September 25, 2012 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Edmonds 183 Report and Recommendation is hereby ACCEPTED and ADOPTED as the findings of fact and conclusions of law by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part in accordance therewith. This matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Bowman for all remaining pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/25/12. (BAC)
January 25, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court *REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court, enter an order Granting in part the plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 176). Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being se rved with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. If objections are not timely filed, they may be deemed waived. Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Report and Recommendation to parties or their counsel. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 1/25/12.(BAC) *Modified on 1/25/2012 to modify to With Opinion(BAC).
March 31, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Edmonds 139 Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification of an Arizona-Only Class is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. Plaintiffs 121 Motion for Class Certification of an Arizona-Only Class is GRA NTED, and a separate Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Certification of an Arizona-Only Class shall be entered. This matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Edmonds for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/31/11.(BAC)
December 7, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court enter an order GRANTING the plaintiffs motion for class certification (Doc. 121). ***See attached PDF for complete information***. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 12/7/10. (BAC) Modified on 12/7/2010 (BAC) TO MODIFY DOCUMENT TYPE, TO WITH OPINION.
March 31, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 96 Report and Recommendations.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 101 Report and Recomm endations. It is further ordered this matter is referred back to Judge Edmonds.***SEE ATTACHED PDF FILE FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION.***Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/31/10.(MLH) FILE DATE HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (4/1/10) TO (3/31/10) ON 4/1/2010 (DTN).
November 10, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support : Recommending that Summary Judgment be GRANTED on the issues of bad faith, punitive damages and prospective injunctive relief. Parties may serve and file written objections within 10 days of being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. Clerk to send copies to the parties or their counsel. **SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 11/9/09. (LSI, ) Modified on 11/10/2009 TO ADD WRITTEN OPINION (LSI, ).
September 2, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 25 denying 12 Motion to Dismiss Case; ORDERED that this action is referred back to Magistrate Judge Edmonds.. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/29/08.(JKM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guadiana v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosemary Guadiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?