Valles et al v. Pima County et al
Plaintiff: Ismat Awdish, Reuben Grinstein, Armando Valles, John Harris, Basseem Challangoe, Halla Awdish, Jorge Alvarez, Hadeel Areny, TDI International Incorporated, Patricia Harris, Jane N Engs, Ramon Escoboza, Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Mark Arellano, Luke Awdish, Felicia Escoboza, Sandra Teran, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, Javier Teran, Deborah Grendahl, Stuart R Engs, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein and Lorena Arellano
Defendant: GC Enterprises GP, Manchester Development Corporation LLC, Thomas E Hosack, Roy H. Long Realty Company Incorporated, West Speedway Partners LLC, David H Mason, Unknown Parties, Martin D Collier, M.L. Parkhurst Construction LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol Incorporated, Pima, County of, GC Management, VMDC Investments Incorporated, Richard A Sack, Desert Vista Engineering LLC, Unknown Party and Albert H Gersten, II
Case Number: 4:2008cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Guerin
Referring Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2015 Filing 310 Satisfaction of Mandate re: #303 Notice of Appeal (BAC)
October 14, 2013 Filing 309 APPEAL DOCUMENT re: #303 Notice of Appeal. Petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (BAC)
February 14, 2013 Filing 308 MANDATE of USCA as to #303 Notice of Appeal, filed by Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Armando Valles, Mark Arellano, Stuart R Engs, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, Reuben Grinstein, Lorena Arellano, TDI International Incorporated, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Ismat Awdish, Sandra Teran, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl, Basseem Challangoe. AFFIRMED. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 NEF)(KAD)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER of USCA as to #303 Notice of Appeal. Petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc is DENIED.(BAC)
April 18, 2011 Filing 306 Taxation Judgment in amount of $ 7,210.50 against plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 04/18/2011. (BJW)
April 1, 2011 Filing 305 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER of USCA as to #303 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, Mark Arellano, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, Reuben Grinstein, Lorena Arellano, TDI International Incorporated, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Ismat Awdish, Sandra Teran, Jane N Engs, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl, Basseem Challangoe. (BAC)
April 1, 2011 Filing 304 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 11-15794 for #303 Notice of Appeal. (BAC)
April 1, 2011 Filing 303 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #300 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions,, by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-5116347. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 18, 2011 Filing 302 BILL OF COSTS by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Service Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Interpreter Costs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Costs)(Flagg, Andrew)
March 4, 2011 Filing 301 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Magistrate Judge Guerin's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 295) is accepted and adopted. Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment (Doc. 276) is denied. Pima County's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 279) is granted and this case is dismissed with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed on 3/2/2011. (GCP)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #295 Report and Recommendations. Denying Plaintiff's #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting Defendant's #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and close the file in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/2/2011. (GCP)
February 22, 2011 Filing 299 REPLY TO OBJECTION to #295 Report and Recommendations filed by Pima, County of. (Flagg, Andrew)
February 4, 2011 Filing 298 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, MarkREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, MarkREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, MarkREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, Mark by Plaintiffs Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Appendix)(Hallinan, Joane) Modified on 2/7/2011 (KDT).INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED; THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM OBJECTION TO OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS.
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #296 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dfts' #294 Motion in Limine. Pla's deadline to respond to Dft's Motion in Limine is extended to ten days following the district court's ruling on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 2/1/2011. (GCP)
January 27, 2011 Filing 296 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MOTION IN LIMINE by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallinan, Joane)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Magistrate recommemds that the District Court, afer it independent review of the record, enter an order DENYING re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reem Challangoe, Gregory Vega, Jorge Alvarez, John Harris, Javier Teran, Halla Awdish, Maxine Grinstein, Deborah Grendahl, Hadeel Areny, Stuart R Engs, Armando Valles, Mark Arellano, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, Reuben Grinstein, Lorena Arellano, TDI International Incorporated, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Ismat Awdish, Sandra Teran, Jane N Engs, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl, Basseem Challangoe, GRANTING re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pima, County of. Awarding judgment in favor of Pima County and directing the Clerk of the Court to close the file in this matter. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION.***. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 1/20/2011. (KDT)
January 14, 2011 Filing 294 MOTION in Limine re: Scope of Expert Steven Magelli's Testimony by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Weaver, Thomas)
December 1, 2010 Filing 293 STATEMENT of REPLY to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #292 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Plaintiffs Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 1, 2010 Filing 292 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #289 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #290 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #290 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's shall file their Reply on or before 12/1/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/30/2010.(KDT)
November 29, 2010 Filing 290 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallinan, Joane)
November 26, 2010 Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply to Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Flagg, Andrew)
November 26, 2010 Filing 288 REPLY to Response to Motion re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pima, County of. (Flagg, Andrew)
November 15, 2010 Filing 287 RESPONSE re #277 Statement,,, of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TOC, Exhibits 1-19)(Flagg, Andrew)
November 15, 2010 Filing 286 RESPONSE to Motion re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pima, County of. (Flagg, Andrew)
November 10, 2010 Filing 285 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment IN SUPPORT OF OUR RESPONSE TO COUNTY'S MSJ filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Appendix)(Hallinan, Joane)
November 10, 2010 Filing 284 RESPONSE to Motion re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #281 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Resppnse thereto may exceed the 17-page limit; the parties briefs shall not exceed 30 pages in length.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 10/21/2010.(KDT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lawrence Flagg on behalf of Pima, County of (Flagg, Andrew)
October 18, 2010 Filing 281 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weaver, Thomas)
October 18, 2010 Filing 280 STATEMENT of of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
October 18, 2010 Filing 279 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, Exhibits 1 -10, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 11-13, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 14-20, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 21-30, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 31-43)(Weaver, Thomas)
October 15, 2010 Filing 278 LODGED Proposed Order Re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
October 15, 2010 Filing 277 STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Facts re #276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Hallinan, Joane)
October 15, 2010 Filing 276 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated, TDI International Incorporated, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane) Modified on 10/18/2010 NOT TEXT SEARCHABLE (KDT).
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Stipulation ; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 10/18/2010; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before 11/18/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 8/9/2010. (JKM)
August 9, 2010 Filing 275 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin: Status Conference held on 8/9/2010. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(BHA)
August 6, 2010 Filing 273 STIPULATION by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Upon the telephonic request of the parties, IT IS ORDERED setting a status conference for 8/9/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Parties are to appear in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. (JCG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
July 9, 2010 Filing 271 Notice re Service by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega 9th Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Hallinan, Joane)
July 7, 2010 Filing 270 STATUS REPORT JOINT SETTLEMENT by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, Pima, County of, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 28, 2010 Filing 269 NOTICE of Deposition of Tim McCann, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 21, 2010 Filing 268 Notice re Service by Pima, County of Notice of Service of Defendant Pima County's Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Weaver, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 Filing 267 NOTICE of Deposition of Tim Robertson, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 Filing 266 NOTICE of Deposition of Ismat and Halla Awdish, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 Filing 265 SUPPLEMENT of Supplemental Notice of Non-Party at Fault Supplemental Notice of Non-Party at Fault by Defendant Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 16, 2010 Filing 264 NOTICE of Deposition of Herb Sudduth, filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #262 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/9/2010. Dispositive motions due by 8/9/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2010.. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 6/8/2010.(KDT)
June 7, 2010 Filing 262 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadlines by Pima, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order re Extension of Discovery Deadlines)(Weaver, Thomas)
June 2, 2010 Filing 261 NOTICE of Deposition of Hadeel Areny, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 2, 2010 Filing 260 NOTICE of Deposition of John and Patricia Harris, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
June 2, 2010 Filing 259 NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Vega, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 26, 2010 Filing 258 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by L Anthony Fines and William G Walker, counsel for Defendants Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, David H. Mason, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC (Walker, William)
May 20, 2010 Filing 257 NOTICE of Deposition of Carmine DeBonis, filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 20, 2010 Filing 256 NOTICE of Deposition of Stuart Engs and Jane Engs, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 20, 2010 Filing 255 NOTICE of Deposition of Reuben Grinstein and Maxine Grinstein, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 20, 2010 Filing 254 NOTICE of Deposition of Basseem Challangoe and Reem Challangoe, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 20, 2010 Filing 253 NOTICE of Deposition of Sandra Teran and Javier Teran, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 20, 2010 Filing 252 NOTICE of Deposition of James Mitchell, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 18, 2010 Filing 251 NOTICE of Deposition of Charles Huckleberry, filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 14, 2010 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of (Weaver, Thomas)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #235 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/13/10.(SMBE)
May 12, 2010 Filing 248 Notice re Notice of Service of Defendant Pima County's Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Pima, County of Pima (Weaver, Thomas)
May 10, 2010 Filing 247 Notice re Notice of Service by Pima, County of Defendant Pima County's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production (Weaver, Thomas)
May 10, 2010 Filing 246 RESPONSE to Motion re #235 Proposed MOTION to Quash Subpeona of Armando Valles filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 7, 2010 Filing 245 NOTICE of Deposition of Armando Valles, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 7, 2010 Filing 244 NOTICE of Deposition of Karen DeJean, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 7, 2010 Filing 243 NOTICE of Deposition of Marvin and Deborah Grendahl, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
May 5, 2010 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of James Mitchell (Weaver, Thomas)
May 5, 2010 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of Ramon and Felicia Escoboza (Weaver, Thomas)
May 5, 2010 Filing 240 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of Armando Valles (Weaver, Thomas)
May 5, 2010 Filing 239 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of Jorge Alvarez (Weaver, Thomas)
May 5, 2010 Filing 238 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pima, County of Mark and Lorena Arellano (Weaver, Thomas)
May 3, 2010 Filing 237 NOTICE of Deposition of Deborah Marchbanks, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ganson, Norris)
April 30, 2010 Filing 236 Notice re ERRATA by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega re #235 Proposed MOTION to Quash Subpeona of Armando Valles NOTICE OF ERRATA (Hallinan, Joane)
April 29, 2010 Filing 235 Proposed MOTION to Quash Subpeona of Armando Valles by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 29, 2010 Filing 234 Notice re of Service by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega 8th Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Hallinan, Joane)
April 27, 2010 Filing 233 NOTICE of Deposition of James Mitchell, filed by Pima, County of. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying #205 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 4/27/2010.(JKM)
April 19, 2010 Filing 231 NOTICE of Deposition of James Mitchell, filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 19, 2010 Filing 230 NOTICE of Deposition of Jorge Alvarez, filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 19, 2010 Filing 229 NOTICE of Deposition of Mark and Lorena Arellano, filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 19, 2010 Filing 228 NOTICE of Deposition of Armando Valles, filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 19, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Deposition of Ramon and Felicia Escoboza, filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 14, 2010 Filing 226 Notice re Service by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega 7th Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Hallinan, Joane)
April 1, 2010 Filing 225 Notice re Service by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
March 30, 2010 Filing 224 STATUS REPORT JOINT SETTLEMENT by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, Pima County, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 29, 2010 Filing 223 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Third Disclosure Statement Re: Expert Witnesses by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 25, 2010 Filing 222 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Supplemental Responses to Pltf's Request for Production by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 25, 2010 Filing 221 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Supplemental Responses to Pltf's Request for Non-Uniform Interrogatories by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 25, 2010 Filing 220 Notice re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' 5th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega by Joane Hallinan, Esq. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 22, 2010 Filing 219 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Non-Uniform Interrogatories by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 22, 2010 Filing 218 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Production by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 16, 2010 Filing 216 Notice re of Service of Pima County's Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Admissions by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 15, 2010 Filing 217 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin: Status Conference held on 3/15/2010. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(JKM)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 IT IS ORDERED setting a status conference on discovery issues for 3/15/2010 at 09:40 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Parties to appear telephonically with the court initiating the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. (JCG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
March 10, 2010 Filing 214 Notice re of Service of Plaintiffs' 4th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
March 10, 2010 Filing 213 Notice re of Service of Pima County's 2nd Supplement Disclosure Statement by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
March 8, 2010 Filing 212 REPLY to Response to Motion re #205 MOTION to Strike re Motion To Strike Notice of Non-Party at Fault filed by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 3, 2010 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION to Strike re Motion To Strike Notice of Non-Party at Fault filed by Pima County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Weaver, Thomas)
March 1, 2010 Filing 210 Notice re Notice of Service of 3rd Supplemental Disclosure by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 18, 2010 Filing 209 Notice re Notice of Service of 1st RFP by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 18, 2010 Filing 208 Notice re NOtice of Service of 1st RFA by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 18, 2010 Filing 207 Notice re Notice of Service of 1st NUI by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 17, 2010 Filing 206 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joane E Hallinan (Hallinan, Joane)
February 17, 2010 Filing 205 MOTION to Strike re Motion To Strike Notice of Non-Party at Fault by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Hallinan, Joane)
February 16, 2010 Filing 204 Notice re Notice of Errata by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 16, 2010 Filing 203 Notice re Notice of Service of Responses to RFA by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 16, 2010 Filing 202 Notice re Notice of Service of NUI by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 16, 2010 Filing 201 Notice re Notice of Service of RFP by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
February 10, 2010 Filing 200 Notice re of Non-Party at Fault by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
February 2, 2010 Filing 199 Notice re Notice of Service of 2nd Supplemental Disclosure by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
January 21, 2010 Filing 198 Notice re of Service of Pima County's First Supp. Disclosure Statement by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
January 13, 2010 Filing 197 Notice re of Service of 2nd Set of Interrogatories by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
January 13, 2010 Filing 196 Notice re of Service of 1st Req. for Admissions by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
January 13, 2010 Filing 195 Notice re of Service of 2nd Request for Production by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #193 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines. ***********SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION.*****. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 12/23/09.(KDT, )
December 21, 2009 Filing 193 MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Witness Deadline)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 9, 2009 Filing 192 Notice re Notice of Service of 1st Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
December 4, 2009 Filing 191 Notice re Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
December 4, 2009 Filing 190 Notice re Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
November 4, 2009 Filing 189 Notice re Service of Pima County's First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
November 4, 2009 Filing 188 Notice re of Pima County's First Request for Production by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
October 16, 2009 Filing 187 Notice re Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure by Jorge Alvarez, Lorena Arellano, Mark Arellano, Hadeel Areny, Halla Awdish, Ismat Awdish, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Jane N Engs, Stuart R Engs, Felicia Escoboza, Ramon Escoboza, Deborah Grendahl, Marvin Grendahl, Maxine Grinstein, Reuben Grinstein, John Harris, Patricia Harris, T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., TDI International, Inc., Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, Armando Valles, Gregory Vega (Hallinan, Joane)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/9/2010. Dispositive motions due by 7/9/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2010. Joint Settlement Status Report due by 1/8/2010 and every 90 days thereafter. **SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 9/16/09. (LSI, )
September 9, 2009 Filing 185 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin: Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2009. FORMAL ORDER TO FOLLOW. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(BHA, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDERED: Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 8/19/09. (JEMB, )
July 31, 2009 Filing 183 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Dfts motions to dismiss [149, 137, 151] are granted. Dfts Parkhurst, Sack, Long Realty, and Mason are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Report & Recommendation #172 as to dfts Hosack and Desert Vista Engineering is accepted and adopted. As such, dfts Hosack and Desert Vista Engineering are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Motion for summary judgment #152 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 7/28/09. (BAC, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Report & Recommendation as to dfts Parkhurst, Mason, Sack, and Long Realty #173 is accepted and adopted; dfts motions to dismiss [149, 137, 151] are granted. Dfts Parkhurst, Sack, Long Realty, and Mason are dismissed without prejudice & Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Report & Recommendation #172 is accepted and adopted and dfts and Hosack and Desert Vista Engineering are dismissed without prejudice; Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Motion for summary judgment #152 is denied as moot. This case referred back to Magistrate Judge Guerin for all pretrial proceedings & report and recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 08-9-TUC-FRZ(JCG). Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 7/28/09.(BAC, )
July 21, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Norris L Ganson on behalf of all plaintiffs (Ganson, Norris)
May 29, 2009 Filing 180 OBJECTION to #172 Report and Recommendations filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 29, 2009 Filing 179 OBJECTION by Defendant M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Baldwin, Howard) DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c), ATTORNEY NOTICED. Modified on 6/1/2009 (SSU, ).
May 29, 2009 Filing 178 OBJECTION to #173 Report and Recommendations filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 29, 2009 Filing 177 OBJECTION to #173 Report and Recommendations filed by David Mason. (Fines, L) Modified on 5/29/2009 (DNO, TO CORRECT FILER).
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #156 Motion for Hearing on Motion; denying #158 Motion for Hearing on Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/8/09.(KMF, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Continue, all parties objections to R&R & Amended R&R due 5/29/09. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 5/8/09.(KMF, )
May 8, 2009 Filing 174 MOTION to Continue Deadlines for Objections to Report & Recommendation and Amended Report & Recommendation by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Pima County, Gregory Vega, David H. Mason, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 7, 2009 Filing 173 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of #171 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason, #149 MOTION to Dismiss Party M. L. Parkhurst Construction, L.L.C., #137 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Non-Compliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/7/09. (KMF, )
May 6, 2009 Filing 172 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #152 Third Party MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Counts : Recommend granting; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/6/09. (KMF, )
May 6, 2009 Filing 171 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason, #149 MOTION to Dismiss Party M. L. Parkhurst Construction, L.L.C., #137 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Non-Compliance with Rule 9 (b) : Recommend granting motions; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/6/06. (KMF, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 170 Notice re Updated Supplemental Authority by David H. Mason re #169 Other Notice (Fines, L)
January 27, 2009 Filing 169 Notice re Supplemental Authority by David H. Mason re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason (Fines, L)
January 15, 2009 Filing 168 STATEMENT of Controverting Statemetn as to Defendants Supplement Statement of Facts re #167 Statement by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
January 7, 2009 Filing 167 STATEMENT of Statement of Facts by Defendants Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC. (Eckel, Neal)
January 7, 2009 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 Third Party MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Counts filed by Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC. (Eckel, Neal)
December 30, 2008 Filing 165 REPLY in Support re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason filed by David H. Mason. (Fines, L)
December 22, 2008 Filing 164 RESPONSE re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supporting Statement of Facts by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 22, 2008 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #152 Third Party MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Counts filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
December 18, 2008 Filing 162 SUPPLEMENT of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Mason's Motion to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint re #160 Response to Motion,, by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 15, 2008 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to Motion re #149 MOTION to Dismiss Party M. L. Parkhurst Construction, L.L.C. filed by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Baldwin, Howard)
December 12, 2008 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 11, 2008 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Non-Compliance with Rule 9 (b) filed by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Aldridge, Lyle)
December 10, 2008 Filing 158 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC. (Eckel, Neal)
December 10, 2008 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss Party M. L. Parkhurst Construction, L.L.C. filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
December 9, 2008 Filing 156 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re Motion to dismiss Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Baldwin, Howard)
December 9, 2008 Filing 155 MOTION re: Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant David H. Mason. (Fines, L) Modified EVENT on 1/7/2009 FROM REQUEST TO MTN FOR HRG ON MTN (KMF, ).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER all previously entered pretrial ddls stayed pending resolution of pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 12/5/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
December 3, 2008 Filing 153 Statement of facts in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment Supporting Statement of Facts by Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC. (Eckel, Neal) Modified on 1/14/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. This entry has been modified from Motion to Statement(PAB, ).
December 3, 2008 Filing 152 Third Party MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Counts by Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC. (Eckel, Neal)
November 28, 2008 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason by David H. Mason. (Fines, L)
November 26, 2008 Filing 150 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint,, by Pima County.(Weaver, Thomas)
November 26, 2008 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss Party M. L. Parkhurst Construction, L.L.C. by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Baldwin, Howard)
November 25, 2008 Filing 148 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint,, by Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC.(Eckel, Neal)
November 24, 2008 Filing 147 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Non-Compliance with Rule 9 (b) filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER pursuant to #140 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Thomas E. Hosack & Desert Vista Engineering, LLC answer due 11/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/18/08. (KMF, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER pursuant to #143 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Third Amended Complaint : David H. Mason answer due 11/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/18/08. (KMF, )
November 14, 2008 Filing 144 ERRATA to document 139 by Defendant M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Baldwin, Howard)
November 14, 2008 Filing 143 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re #136 Amended Complaint,, by David H. Mason. (Fines, L)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER pursuant to #139 Stipulation, M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC answer to Third Amended Complaint due 11/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/12/08. (KMF, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER pursuant to #138 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Third Amended Complaint, Pima County answer due 11/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/12/08. (KMF, )
November 12, 2008 Filing 140 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Thomas E. Hosack. (Eckel, Neal)
November 11, 2008 Filing 139 STIPULATION by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC. (Baldwin, Howard)
November 10, 2008 Filing 138 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (THIRD AMENDED) by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
November 10, 2008 Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Non-Compliance with Rule 9 (b) by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Aldridge, Lyle)
October 24, 2008 Filing 136 AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD) against all defendants;Jury Demand, filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Hallinan, Joane)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Extension of Time, all ddls re order #133 continued for 40 days. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/17/08.(KMF, )
September 17, 2008 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time of all deadlines for forty (40) days (Partial Stipulation) by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Pima County, Gregory Vega, M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC, Javier Teran, Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc., Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER finding as moot #52 Motion to Dismiss Case; finding as moot #67 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot #97 Report and Recommendations; finding as moot #98 Report and Recommendations; finding as moot #112 Motion to Dismiss Party. FURTHER ORDERED Pla's have leave to file Third Amended Complaint by 9/19/08; Dft's shall file any new motions to dismiss no later than 10/6/08; Responses to motions to dismiss are due 15 days from the filing of the motions; Replies to responses are due 10 days from the filing of the responses. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/8/08.**SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**(JEMB, )
September 5, 2008 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Party Richard Sack and Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Aldridge, Lyle)
September 2, 2008 Filing 131 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees of $5482 & costs of $215 in favor of Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC against Armando Valles, et al. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/29/08. (KMF, )
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #90 & #101 granting #66 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting #69 Motion for Sanctions; West & the Villas are dismissed w/o prejudice & are awarded $5482 in attys' fees & $215 in costs; Clk Crt to enter jgm. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/29/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Party Richard Sack and Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hallinan, Joane)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER pursuant to #125 Stipulation : all pending pretrial ddls stayed until R&R #97 ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 8/8/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
August 11, 2008 Filing 127 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pima County, David H. Mason, M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC, Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Armando Valles, et al. Party Company C; Company D; Company E; Jane Does; John Does; GC Enterprises GP; Albert H. Gersten, II; Manchester Development Corporation, LLC; VMDC Investments, Inc.; Martin D Collier and Company B terminated.(KMF, ) Modified date on 8/11/2008 (KMF, ).
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #119 Motion to file second amended complaint, Clk Crt to file lodged doc #120 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 8/8/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
August 7, 2008 Filing 125 STIPULATION TO STAY PENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER, pursuant to #123 Stipulation, all pending ddls stayed until R&R ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 8/6/08. See attached pdf for complete information(KMF, )
July 31, 2008 Filing 123 STIPULATION to Stay Pending Pretrial Deadlines by West Speedway Partners, LLC, David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, William)
July 29, 2008 Filing 122 Notice re Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure Statement by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl (Hallinan, Joane)
July 29, 2008 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl re #120 Lodged Proposed Document,, #119 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint with proposed 2nd Amended Complaint compared to Amended Complaint attached (Hallinan, Joane)
July 29, 2008 Filing 120 LODGED Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint re: #119 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint with proposed 2nd Amended Complaint compared to Amended Complaint attached. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
July 29, 2008 Filing 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint with proposed 2nd Amended Complaint compared to Amended Complaint attached by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hallinan, Joane)
July 29, 2008 Filing 118 Notice re Filing Initial Disclosure Statement by Thomas E. Hosack (Eckel, Neal)
July 29, 2008 Filing 117 Notice re service of initial disclosure by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC (Baldwin, Howard)
July 25, 2008 Filing 116 Notice re Initial Disclosure by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
July 24, 2008 Filing 115 RESPONSE re #111 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, by Defendants David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC. (Fines, L)
July 18, 2008 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Pima CountyREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Pima County Response to Plaintiff's Objection filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER 5/29/08 subpoena to CIC quashed; granting #95 CIC's obj to subpoena; denying as moot #94 Motion to modify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 7/17/08.(KMF, )
July 15, 2008 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Party Richard Sack and Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. For Lack of Jurisdiction by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Aldridge, Lyle)
July 7, 2008 Filing 111 OBJECTION to #98 Report and Recommendations Re: Defendants Mason and Manchester filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
July 7, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Joane E Hallinan on behalf of all plaintiffs (Hallinan, Joane)
July 7, 2008 Filing 109 Notice re Errata by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl re #106 Objection to Report and Recommendations, (Hallinan, Joane)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER written ojections to Court presiding over the case due 7/16/08. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 7/7/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 107 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #106 Objection to Report and Recommendations, Certificate of Mailing of Objection to Hon. Frank R. Zapata by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
July 3, 2008 Filing 106 OBJECTION to #97 Report and Recommendations filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 27, 2008 Filing 105 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #104 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Certificate of Mailing to Capitol Indemnity by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 26, 2008 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION for to Modify Plaintiff's Subpoena Re Extending Deadline to Respond filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/30/2008. Dispositive motions due by 1/23/2009. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2009. Joint Settlement Status Report due by 9/24/2008 & every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/25/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
June 25, 2008 Filing 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #99 Stipulation of attys' fees & costs; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/25/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
June 25, 2008 Filing 100 STIPULATION re #99 Stipulation Proposed Order by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Fines, L)
June 24, 2008 Filing 103 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Guerin: Scheduling Conference held on 6/24/2008. Formal Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(SSG)
June 24, 2008 Filing 99 STIPULATION re #93 Order, for Attorneys' Fees by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Fines, L)
June 24, 2008 Filing 98 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason and Manchester Development; objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/24/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
June 24, 2008 Filing 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Pima County; written objections due w/in 10 days using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/24/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 96 RESPONSE re #90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hallinan, Joane)
June 12, 2008 Filing 95 OBJECTION to Subpoena by Objector Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mann, Jay)
June 12, 2008 Filing 94 MOTION for to Modify Plaintiff's Subpoena Re Extending Deadline to Respond by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Mann, Jay)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs & #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC; Ordered West & the Villas to file request for attys' fees w/in 14 days of the date of this order; West & the Villas are excused from participation in the scheduling conference set for 6/24/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/10/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
June 10, 2008 Filing 92 Notice re of Errata by David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC re #91 Reply in Support of Motion (Fines, L)
June 9, 2008 Filing 91 REPLY in Support re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason and Manchester Development filed by David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC. (Fines, L)
June 9, 2008 Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs & #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-FRZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 6/6/08. (KMF, )
June 5, 2008 Filing 89 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin: taking under advisement #52 Motion to Dismiss Case; Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2008 re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Pima County. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(BHA, )
June 5, 2008 Filing 88 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin: taking under advisement #66 Motion to Dismiss Case; taking under advisement #69 Motion for Sanctions; Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2008 re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, West Speedway Partners, LLC. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(BHA, )
May 22, 2008 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Weaver, Jr on behalf of Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
May 21, 2008 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason and Manchester Development filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-G)(Hallinan, Joane)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER, Hearing set as to #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2008 at 04:00PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/15/08. (KMF, )
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER, Hearing set on #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2008 at 03:00PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/14/08. (KMF, )
May 13, 2008 Filing 83 Notice re Compliance with Order dated May 9, 2008 by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl re #78 Order, (Hallinan, Joane)
May 12, 2008 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs filed by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Fines, L)
May 12, 2008 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Fines, L)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/8/08.(KMF, )
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. & #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc.: Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2008 at 03:30PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/8/08. (KMF, )
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER plas provide courtesy copies of amended cmp & all responses to dfts' motions to dismiss to Judge Guerin's Chambers w/in 5 days; parties to comply w/ Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/8/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling conference set for 6/24/08 at 3:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Guerin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 5/8/08. (KMF, ) Modified on 5/19/2008 (BAR, to change text from scheduling order to order setting scheduling conference).
May 1, 2008 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by William G Walker on behalf of West Speedway Partners, LLC, David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc (Walker, William)
April 30, 2008 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 30, 2008 Filing 74 STATEMENT of Facts in support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by WSP and Villas re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 30, 2008 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part I), #3 Exhibit B (part II), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 29, 2008 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Pima County. (Weaver, Thomas)
April 24, 2008 Filing 71 Notice re Association of Counsel by David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC (Walker, William)
April 23, 2008 Filing 70 STATUS REPORT pursuant to the Courts Order dated April 17, 2008 by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 23, 2008 Filing 69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Fines, L)
April 22, 2008 Filing 68 Notice re Notice of Association of Counsel by Pima County (Weaver, Thomas)
April 21, 2008 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Party Mason and Manchester Development by David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC. (Fines, L)
April 21, 2008 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Case by West Speedway Partners, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss)(Fines, L)
April 21, 2008 Filing 65 Defendants Hosack and Desert Vista Engineering's ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by Thomas E. Hosack.(Eckel, Neal)
April 21, 2008 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #33 Amended Complaint, Affidavit of Service upon Defendant Albert Gersten, II by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re #53 Motion to Continue; 4/25/08 scheduling conference vacated; 4/18/08 joint rpt ddl vacated; plas to file rpt w/in 20 days of the filing date of this order; dft objections to the rpt due w/in 10 days of the date rpt is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 4/17/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )
April 14, 2008 Filing 62 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #58 MOTION to Produce Documents and 30(b)(6) Deposition of Capitol Indemnity Corporation MOTION to Produce Documents and 30(b)(6) Deposition of Capitol Indemnity Corporation MOTION to Produce Documents and 30(b)(6) Deposition of Capitol Indemnity Corporation Exhibit A to Motion to Produce Documents by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 14, 2008 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #33 Amended Complaint, Affidavit of Service of Amended Complaint on Defendant GC Enterprises by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 14, 2008 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #33 Amended Complaint, Affidavit of Service of Amended Complaint on Defendant VMDC Investments by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 14, 2008 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #33 Amended Complaint, Affidavit of Service of Amended Complaint on Defendant Martin D. Collier by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 14, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION to Produce Documents and 30(b)(6) Deposition of Capitol Indemnity Corporation by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena & 30(b)(6) Deposition)(Hallinan, Joane)
April 14, 2008 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 10, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution adding Lesley Maura Lukach for Pima County (Lukach, Lesley) Modified on 4/10/2008 to delete duplicate attorney name(BJW, ).
April 4, 2008 Filing 55 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC.(KMF, )
April 4, 2008 Filing 54 Lodged Proposed Document re #53 Joint MOTION to Continue the Scheduling Conference currently calendared for April 25, 2008 Proposed Order regarding the Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl, Defendants Pima County, West Speedway Partners, LLC, David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC, Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 4, 2008 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Continue the Scheduling Conference currently calendared for April 25, 2008 by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Pima County, West Speedway Partners, LLC, Gregory Vega, David H. Mason, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc, M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC, Javier Teran, Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc., Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
April 2, 2008 Filing 52 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Pima County. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(McDonald, Scott)
April 1, 2008 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC served on 3/30/2008. (KMF, )
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2008 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin in her courtroom. (Time & location change.) Joint rpt due 5 business days prior to scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 4/1/08. (KMF, )
March 31, 2008 Filing 49 Defendants Thomas Hosack and Desert Vista Engineering's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Thomas E. Hosack.(Eckel, Neal)
March 28, 2008 Filing 48 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, Defendants by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc..(Aldridge, Lyle)
March 26, 2008 Filing 47 Additional Attachments to Main Document Plaintiff's Request for Clarification by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 26, 2008 Filing 46 REQUEST re: Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
March 24, 2008 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. Thomas E. Hosack served on 3/20/2008. (CKM, )
March 24, 2008 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. Manchester Development Corporation, LLC served on 3/20/2008. (CKM, )
March 24, 2008 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. Desert Vista Engineering, LLC served on 3/20/2008. (CKM, )
March 24, 2008 Filing 39 Letter from Loren Bates; Re; Long Realty not being listed on records of the Az Corporation Commission (LMF, )
March 21, 2008 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. David H. Mason served on 3/20/2008. (CKM, )
March 20, 2008 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. Pima County served on 3/14/2008. (CKM, )
March 19, 2008 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. Richard A Sack served on 3/14/2008. (CKM, )
March 19, 2008 Filing 38 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction (LMF, )
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER referred back to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 3/18/08. (LSI, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 36 Minute Order Judge Frank R Zapata added. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin no longer assigned to case. (LMF, )
March 13, 2008 Filing 35 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction (LMF, )
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations #29 ; granting plas' request for voluntary dismissal of dfts West Speedway Partners, LLC & The Villas at Hacienda del Sol, Inc #20 , these dfts dismissed w/o prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 3/13/08.(KMF, )
March 11, 2008 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT Declaratory releif; gross negligence; violation of due process; promissory estoppel; breach of contract; misrepresentation; fraudulent conveyance; negligence against defendants Pima County et al; Jury Demand, filed by Armando Valles et al(KMF, )
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion for leave to file amended cmp; Clk Crt to file LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint; plas to serve dfts w/ amended cmp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 3/11/08. (KMF, )
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin's law clerk. Joint rpt due NLT 5 business days bfr the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 3/7/08. (KMF, )
March 4, 2008 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc..(Aldridge, Lyle)
February 25, 2008 Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #20 request for voluntary dismissal of #1 Complaint; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 08cv9-TUC-DCB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 2/25/08. See attached pdf for complete information(KMF, )
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT, Richard A Sack answer due 3/4/2008; Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. answer due 3/4/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 2/25/08. (KMF, )
February 22, 2008 Filing 27 LODGED Proposed Order Re: MTN to Amend. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 26 LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hallinan, Joane)
February 13, 2008 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Rollman, Richard)
February 13, 2008 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc., Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time for Answer by Defendants Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. and Richard A. Sack)(Rollman, Richard)
February 13, 2008 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint,,,, Verification of Complaint by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
February 13, 2008 Filing 21 LODGED Proposed Order regarding Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
February 13, 2008 Filing 20 REQUEST re: Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants West Speedway Partners and the Villas at Hacienda Del Sol by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
February 8, 2008 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC.(KMF, )
January 22, 2008 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. West Speedway Partners, LLC served on 1/13/2008. (KMF, )
January 18, 2008 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Manchester Development Corporation, LLC served on 1/13/2008. (KMF, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. David H. Mason served on 1/13/2008. (KMF, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Thomas E. Hosack served on 1/12/2008. (KMF, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #3 Summons Issued,,, Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on VMDC by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
January 16, 2008 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #3 Summons Issued,,, Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Martin D. Collier by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
January 16, 2008 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Jo Lynn Clapperton re #3 Summons Issued,,, Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Albert Gersten, II by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
January 15, 2008 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc. served on 1/9/2008. (KMF, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc served on 1/10/2008. (KMF, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Desert Vista Engineering, LLC served on 1/10/2008. (KMF, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, #5 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, #1 Complaint,,,, Verification of Complaint by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
January 14, 2008 Filing 19 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (LSI, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC served on 1/9/2008. (KMF, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armando Valles. Richard A Sack served on 1/9/2008. (KMF, )
January 11, 2008 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint,,,, Verifications of Complaint by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart R Engs, Jane N Engs, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Verification of Complaint, #3 Verification of Complaint, #4 Verification of Complaint, #5 Verification of Complaint, #6 Verification of Complaint)(Hallinan, Joane)
January 10, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. Pima County served on 1/9/2008. (LSI, )
January 8, 2008 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (TO BE MAILED) (LMF, )
January 7, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pima County, West Speedway Partners, LLC, Martin D Collier, David H. Mason, Albert H. Gersten, II, Manchester Development Corporation, LLC, VMDC Investments, Inc., The Villas at Hacienda Del Sol, Inc., M.L. Parkhurst Construction, LLC, Thomas E. Hosack, Desert Vista Engineering, LLC, GC Enterprises GP, Richard A Sack, Roy H. Long Realty Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(JEMB, ). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
January 4, 2008 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint,,,, Verification of Complaint by Plaintiffs Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart Engs, Jane Eng, Stuart R. and Jane N. Engs Family Trust, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Hadeel Areny Trust, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Hallinan, Joane)
January 3, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer C. Guerin. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-08-9-TUC-JCG. (JEMB, )
January 3, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000001639931, filed by Deborah Grendahl, Reuben Grinstein, Maxine Grinstein, Ramon Escoboza, Felicia Escoboza, Stuart Engs, Jane Eng, Basseem Challangoe, Reem Challangoe, Armando Valles, Hadeel Areny, Jorge Alvarez, Mark Arellano, Lorena Arellano, Ismat Awdish, Halla Awdish, Gregory Vega, Javier Teran, Sandra Teran, TDI International, Inc., T.F. Robertson Companies, Inc., John Harris, Patricia Harris, Marvin Grendahl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Collier, #3 Summons Hosack, #4 Summons Long, #5 Summons Manchester, #6 Summons Mason, #7 Summons Parkhurst, #8 Summons Pima County, #9 Summons Gersten, #10 Summons GC Enterprises, #11 Summons Sack, #12 Summons Desert Vista, #13 Summons Villas, #14 Summons VMDC, #15 Summons WSP, #16 Exhibit A - Final Plat, #17 Exhibit B - Initial Assurances, #18 Exhibit C - Public Report, #19 Exhibit D - Sub. Assurances, #20 Exhibit E - Purchase Contract, #21 Exhibit F - Performance Bond, #22 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Jim Mitchell, #23 Exhibit H - Request to draw on Bond)(Hallinan, Joane) Modified on 1/7/2008 to delete improperly names parties(PAB, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valles et al v. Pima County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismat Awdish
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Grinstein
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Valles
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harris
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basseem Challangoe
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halla Awdish
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Alvarez
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hadeel Areny
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TDI International Incorporated
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Harris
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane N Engs
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Escoboza
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reem Challangoe
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Vega
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Arellano
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Awdish
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Escoboza
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Teran
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.F. Robertson Companies Incorporated
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Teran
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Grendahl
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart R Engs
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Grendahl
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Grinstein
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Arellano
Represented By: Norris L Ganson
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Enterprises GP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Development Corporation LLC
Represented By: William G Walker
Represented By: L Anthony Fines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Hosack
Represented By: Neal Allen Eckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy H. Long Realty Company Incorporated
Represented By: Richard M Rollman
Represented By: Lyle D Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Speedway Partners LLC
Represented By: William G Walker
Represented By: L Anthony Fines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Mason
Represented By: William G Walker
Represented By: L Anthony Fines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.L. Parkhurst Construction LLC
Represented By: Howard L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villas at Hacienda Del Sol Incorporated
Represented By: William G Walker
Represented By: L Anthony Fines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima, County of
Represented By: Thomas Weaver, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Lawrence Flagg
Represented By: Lesley Maura Lukach
Represented By: Scott David McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMDC Investments Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Sack
Represented By: Richard M Rollman
Represented By: Lyle D Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Vista Engineering LLC
Represented By: Neal Allen Eckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert H Gersten, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?