Dimmig v. Pima County et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Dimmig
Defendant: Pima County, Pima County Sheriff Clarence W. Dupnik, Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Laura Ybarra, John Doe Ybarra, Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Scott McLeod, Jane Doe McLeod, Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Steven Love, Jane Doe Love, Jane Does 1-10, XYZ Corporation 1-10 and ABC Corporation 1-10
Case Number: 4:2009cv00189
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/29/2012.(JKM)
March 11, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants Motion to Dismiss 42 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims based upon policy, custom and practice, and against Defendant Sheriff Clarence Dupnik in his individual capacity are dismissed. Plaintiffs expert witness disclosure due by 4/1111; defendants expert witness disclosure due by 6/10/11; Rebuttal expert disclosure due by 7/11/11; Dispositive motions due by 9/1/11. A Joint Proposed Pretrial Order shall be filed by 10/3/11, or within 30 days of the Courts ruling on any pre-trial motion. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/10/11.(BAC) Modified on 3/11/2011 to modify document to Opinion(BAC).
February 1, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying as moot all other pending motions 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are directed to Answer or file a responsive pleading as to Plaintiff's 1983 claims within 40 days from the date of this Order. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION.***. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/29/2010.(KDT) Modified on 2/2/2010 (JEMB TO INDICATE WO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimmig v. Pima County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Dimmig
Represented By: Brick P Storts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Sheriff Clarence W. Dupnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Laura Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Scott McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima County Sheriff's Deputy Steven Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?