Stafford v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Warren Frank Stafford
Respondent: Charles L. Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 4:2009cv00363
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Referring Judge: Glenda E Edmonds (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 27 Report and Recommendations. the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) is denied and this action is dismissed with prejudice. A Final Judgment shall enter separately. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 10/30/12. (LMF)
October 9, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate judge recommends that the District Court enter an order denying the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on the merits filed by Warren Frank Stafford. The parties may serve and file written objections w ithin 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. If objections are not timely filed, they may be deemed waived. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this report and recommendation to the petitioner and the respondents (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/9/2012. (MFR)
May 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Report and Recommendations. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and dismissed as time-barred. Certificate of Appealability is denied. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 5/25/10.(SSU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Frank Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?