Escobar v. Brewer et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Martin H Escobar
Defendant: Jan Brewer, Tucson, City of and Phoenix, City of
Cross_defendant: Arizona, State of and Jan Brewer
Cross_claimant: Tucson, City of
Intervenor_plaintiff: Flagstaff, City of, Tolleson, City of, San Luis, City of and Somerton, City of
Case Number: 4:2010cv00249
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER dismissing the cross-claim filed by the City of Tucson without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/16/10. (ESL)
September 13, 2010 Filing 99 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Tucson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCrory, Michael)
September 7, 2010 Filing 100 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 10-16946 for 97 Notice of Appeal. (BAC)
September 7, 2010 Filing 98 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re 32 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Plaintiffs Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Rivera, Jose)
September 6, 2010 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 96 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,,, by Martin H Escobar. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-4305708. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Certification of Service)(Martinez, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Dft Janice K. Brewer's 55 Motion to Dismiss. Pla's First Amended Complaint is dismissed for lack of standing; denying Pla's First 20 Motion to Consolidate, Pla's Second 79 Motion to Consolidate, and Pla's 71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; directing Dft City of Tucson to show cause, within 14 days from the date of this Order, why the entire action, including the City of Tucson's Crossclaim (Doc. 9), should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/31/10. (ESL)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that pursuant to the 94 Stipulation filed by defendant Janice Brewer and Defendant/cross-plaintiff City of Tucson, it is ordered that Tucson's response to Brewer's motion for judgment on the pleadings shall be filed no later than 10/01/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/31/10. (ESL)
August 30, 2010 Filing 94 STIPULATION re 68 MOTION for Judgment On The Pleadings for 2nd extension of time to file Tucson's Response to Brewer's Motion for Jdgmt on the Pleadings by Jan Brewer, Jan Brewer, Tucson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCrory, Michael)
August 20, 2010 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Wolfson v. Brammer, # 2 Exhibit Comparison Table, # 3 Exhibit List of INA Criminal Offenses)(Martinez, Richard)
August 20, 2010 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Complaint filed by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Defendant Brewer's 40 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Claim Filed by the City of Tucson. Defendant Brewer's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed 07/02/10 is accepted as timely filed. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/13/10.(ESL)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting Cross-Defendant State of Arizona's 54 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing the cross-claim filed against it. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/13/10.(ESL)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Defendant Jan Brewer's 56 Motion to Dismiss (All Claims in her Individual Capacity). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/13/10.(ESL)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that pursuant to the 85 stipulation filed by defendant Janice Brewer and defendant/cross-plaintiff City of Tucson, and good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Tucson's response to Brewer's motion for judgment on the pleadings shall be filed no later than 09/10/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/11/10. (ESL)
August 10, 2010 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Complaint filed by Martin H Escobar. (Martinez, Richard)
August 10, 2010 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jan Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bouma, John)
August 10, 2010 Filing 85 STIPULATION re 68 MOTION for Judgment On The Pleadings Stipulation for Extension of time to file Tucson's Response by Jan Brewer, Jan Brewer, Tucson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCrory, Michael)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Pursuant to the 82 stipulation submitted by defendant/cross-plaintiff City of Tucson and defendant/cross-defendant Janice K. Brewer, the City of Tucson's motion for preliminary injunction (doc. 72) is hereby withdrawn without prejudice to the filing of any other motion. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/10/10. (ESL)
August 9, 2010 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases GOVERNOR BREWER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
August 5, 2010 Filing 82 STIPULATION Regarding Withdrawal of the City of Tucson's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jan Brewer, Jan Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
August 3, 2010 Filing 81 JOINDER re 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/3/2010 (ESL).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF ORDER in CV10-1413-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/28/10. (note: see attached pdf for complete details).(ESL)
July 21, 2010 Filing 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Richard)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER pursuant to the 77 Stipulation filed by Martin Escobar, Janice Brewer and City of Tucson, the following responses shall be filed no later than 08/10/10: Pla's responses to motions to dismiss filed by Governor Brewer (docs. 55 and 56). Governor Brewer's response to pla' motion for preliminary injunction (doc. 71). Tucson's response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Governor Brewer (doc. 68). Governor Brewer's response to Tucson's motion for preliminary injunction (doc. 72). All replies in support of these motions shall be filed by 08/20/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/13/10. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION and Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions by Jan Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
July 12, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Michael M. Walker. (Walker, Michael)
July 8, 2010 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Fidel, Nathan)
July 8, 2010 Filing 75 ERRATA by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of (Fidel, Nathan) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. Modified on 7/9/2010 (ESL).
July 8, 2010 Filing 74 REPLY in Support re 32 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Fidel, Nathan) CORRECTION: incorrect linkage. Modified on 7/9/2010 (ESL).
July 8, 2010 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Arizona filed by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
July 8, 2010 Filing 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tucson, City of. (REW)
July 8, 2010 Filing 71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Enforcement of the "Support Our Law Enforcement and Safe Neighborhood Act" aka SB 1070 by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(REW)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER, denying Plaintiff Intervenors' 63 Motion for Leave to File Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Exceed the Page Limitation as premature; granting Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation and Cross-Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation; Plaintiff's Motion lodged at Document 17 and Cross-Plaintiff's Motion lodged at Document 22 shall be filed as of this date; deeming moot Cross-Plaintiff City of Tucson's 66 Joint Motion for Proposed Briefing Schedule on Tucsons Cross-Claim (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/8/10.(REW)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: On July 2, 2010, the City of Tucson filed a Joint Motion Proposing Briefing Schedule on City of Tucson's Cross-Claim. IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion Proposing Briefing Schedule on City of Tucson's Cross-Claim will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/6/10. (MAW)
July 2, 2010 Filing 68 MOTION for Judgment On The Pleadings by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
July 2, 2010 Filing 67 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 66 Request Proposed form of Order setting briefing schedule on Tucson's Cross-claim by Defendant Tucson, City of, Cross Claimant Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
July 2, 2010 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Proposed Briefing Schedule on Tucson's Cross-claim by Defendant Tucson, City of, Cross Claimant Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (motion) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ESL).
June 29, 2010 Filing 65 Notice re Pending Motions by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of (Fidel, Nathan)
June 29, 2010 Filing 64 LODGED Proposed Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis and Somerton's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J-1, # 5 Exhibit J-2)(Fidel, Nathan)
June 29, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis and Somerton's Motion for Leave to File Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Their Complaint and To Exceed the Page Limitation by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidel, Nathan)
June 29, 2010 Filing 62 RESPONSE re 59 Status Report by Defendant Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 29, 2010 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT on pending motions by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 28, 2010 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 28, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Nathan Fidel. (Fidel, Nathan)
June 28, 2010 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT On Pending Motions by Martin H Escobar. (Martinez, Richard)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting the Pla's Motion to Transfer Related Case (docket #8 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB). Further ordered granting the Motion to Transfer Related Cases to this Court filed by Governor Brewer (docket 13 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB. Further ordered transferring the following cases to this Court: CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS. Directing the Plas in CV 10-926-PHX-SRB, CV 10-943-PHX-SRB, CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS to file a notice summarizing all pending motions in each case and the briefing status of those motions, no later than 5:00 p.m. on 06/29/10. It is further ordered that all future filings in the transferred cases shall bear the following case numbers: CV 10-249-TUC-SRB, CV 10-951-PHX-SRB, and CV 10-1061-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/25/10. (ESL)
June 24, 2010 Filing 57 Notice re Response to Joinder in Requests for Consolidation by Jan Brewer (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Party Janice K. Brewer in her individual capacity by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Complaint by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Arizona by Arizona, State of. (Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Bouma on behalf of Arizona, State of (Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 52 Joinder IN REQUESTS FOR CONSOLIDATION by Intervenor Plaintiffs Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Rivera, Jose)
June 22, 2010 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 22, 2010 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 22, 2010 Filing 49 Notice re of Filing Response to Request for Transfer/Consolidation by Tucson, City of (McCrory, Michael)
June 21, 2010 Filing 48 RESPONSE re 9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Answer to Cross-Claim) by Defendant Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 21, 2010 Filing 47 Notice re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONA by Arizona, State of (O'Grady, Mary)
June 18, 2010 Filing 46 REPLY in Support re 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Martin H Escobar. (Martinez, Richard)
June 18, 2010 Filing 45 Joinder in Pl's Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Defendant Tucson, City of, Cross Claimant Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 18, 2010 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time for Responses to the Cross-Claim filed by Martin H Escobar. (Martinez, Richard)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Pending before the Court in CV10-0926-PHX-SRB are two Motions to Transfer Related Cases. One filed by Defendant Governor Janice K. Brewer (dkt #13) requesting to transfer CV10-0249-TUC-DCB and CV10-0951-PHX-ROS to this Court and one filed by Plaintiffs in case number CV10-1061-PHX-JWS (dkt. #8). Any party who wishes to file a response either in opposition or in support of the Motions to Transfer must do so by 5:00 p.m. on June 23, 2010. Any response filed shall be filed in case number CV 10-926-PHX SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/10. (MAW)
June 17, 2010 Filing 42 REPLY in Support re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time for Responses to the Cross-Claim filed by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 16, 2010 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time for Responses to the Cross-Claim filed by Tucson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Time Schedule Order)(McCrory, Michael)
June 16, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time for Responses to the Cross-Claim by Jan Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
June 14, 2010 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Request for Transfer/Consolidation by Defendant City of Phoenix. (Verburg, Gary)
June 12, 2010 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Martin H Escobar. (Martinez, Richard)
June 11, 2010 Filing 34 Notice re of Motion to Intervene by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of (Rivera, Jose)
June 11, 2010 Filing 33 LODGED Proposed COMPLAINT (In Intervention) re: 32 MOTION to Intervene. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Rivera, Jose)
June 11, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by Flagstaff, City of, Tolleson, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera, Jose)
June 11, 2010 Filing 31 Notice re Filing Escobar Response to Defendant Brewer's Motion for Transfer in Frisancho v. Brewer, et. al. by Martin H Escobar (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of Escobar Response to Defendant Brewer's Motion for Transfer)(Martinez, Richard)
June 10, 2010 Filing 30 Reply re 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases (in Support of) by Defendant Tucson, City of, Cross Claimant Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 10, 2010 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jan Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 10, 2010 Filing 28 Notice re of Filing Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer by Jan Brewer (Attachments: # 1 Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Cases to a Single Judge)(Bouma, John)
June 9, 2010 Filing 37 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons, Answer & Cross-Claim served on Ken Bennett on 5/28/2010, filed by Tucson, City of. (BAR)
June 9, 2010 Filing 36 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons, Answer & Cross-Claim served on Jan Brewer on 5/28/2010, filed by Tucson, City of. (BAR)
June 9, 2010 Filing 35 RETURN OF SERVICE of Answer and Cross-Claim, Summons served on Terry Goddard on 5/28/2010, filed by Tucson, City of. (BAR)
June 9, 2010 Filing 27 Notice re Non-objection to City's motion to exceed page limit for City's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tucson, City of (McCrory, Michael)
June 8, 2010 Filing 26 Notice by Tucson, City of re 25 Other Notice Non-objection to Pl's Motion to Exceed Page Limit (McCrory, Michael)
June 7, 2010 Filing 25 Notice re DEFENDANTS HAVING NO OBJECTION TO THE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION by Martin H Escobar (Montoya, Stephen)
June 7, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Martin H Escobar. Party Barbara LaWall terminated. (Montoya, Stephen)
June 7, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 7, 2010 Filing 22 LODGED motion Preliminary Injunction by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)LODGED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ATTORNEY NOTICED DOCUMENT WAS LODGED PENDING ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS Modified on 6/11/2010 (LMF).
June 7, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limitations by Tucson, City of. (McCrory, Michael)
June 4, 2010 Filing 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Richard)
June 3, 2010 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin H Escobar. Jan Brewer served on 6/2/2010. (Montoya, Stephen)
June 3, 2010 Filing 17 LODGED Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining THe Enforcement Of The "SUPPORT OUR LAW ENFORCEMENT AND SAFE NEIGHBORHOOD ACT" a.k.a. SB 1070. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(Martinez, Richard)
June 2, 2010 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tucson, City of (JKM)
June 2, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Arthur Munns on behalf of Arizona, State of (Munns, Christopher)
June 2, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ruth O'Grady on behalf of Arizona, State of (O'Grady, Mary)
June 1, 2010 Filing 14 Notice re Notice of Filing Affidavit in Support of Complaint for Injunctive Relief by Tucson, City of (McCrory, Michael)
May 31, 2010 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Points & Authorities Supporting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Richard)
May 28, 2010 Filing 12 Notice re Filing Motion to Transfer by Jan Brewer (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Bouma, John)
May 27, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Bouma on behalf of Jan Brewer (Bouma, John)
May 27, 2010 Filing 10 Notice re Service to Atty General of AZ by Tucson, City of re 9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (McCrory, Michael)
May 26, 2010 Filing 9 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against State of Arizona by Tucson, City of.(McCrory, Michael)
May 25, 2010 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Barbara LaWall on 5/20/2010, filed by Martin H Escobar., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin H Escobar. Barbara LaWall served on 5/20/2010., SUMMONS Submitted by Martin H Escobar (Martinez, Richard)
May 25, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin H Escobar. Tucson, City of served on 5/20/2010., SUMMONS Submitted by Martin H Escobar (Martinez, Richard)
May 20, 2010 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jan Brewer, Barbara LaWall, Tucson, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(GPA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 19, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Martin H Escobar (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Martinez, Richard)
May 18, 2010 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants ; Party Terry Goddard terminated, filed by Martin H Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Richard)
April 29, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G Montoya on behalf of Martin H. Escobar (Montoya, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C. Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 10-CV-249-TUC-DCB. (PAA)
April 29, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-3868932, filed by Martin H. Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martinez, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin H Escobar
Represented By: Augustine B Jimenez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Brewer
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucson, City of
Represented By: Michael WL McCrory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Elaine K Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jan Brewer
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Tucson, City of
Represented By: Michael WL McCrory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Flagstaff, City of
Represented By: David Lawrence Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tolleson, City of
Represented By: David Lawrence Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: San Luis, City of
Represented By: David Lawrence Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Somerton, City of
Represented By: David Lawrence Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?