Hollenback v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: |
Robert Michael Hollenback |
Respondent: |
Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona |
Case Number: |
4:2010cv00333 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Tucson Division Office |
County: |
Pinal |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R Pyle |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank R Zapata |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 15, 2014 |
Filing
31
*ORDER that Respondents' motion for reconsideration and to amend/alter the judgment is GRANTED in part (Doc. 20 ). This Court's Order (Doc. 18 ) entered on September 20, 2013 is AMENDED to reflect the denial of Ground Four with pr ejudice for the reasons stated in the Order. This Court's Order is FURTHER AMENDED to vacate this Court's order directing the state court to vacate Count 1 of Petitioner's conviction. The Clerk of Court shall amend the Judgment (Doc. 19 ) to reflect that the Petition (Doc. 1 ) is denied with prejudice and the action is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 5/14/2014.(MFR) *Modified on 5/15/2014 (MFR).
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Robert Michael Hollenback. It is Ordered that Grounds One, Two and Three of the Petition (Doc. 1) are denied with prejudice. It is further O rdered that Ground Four of the Petition is granted to the extent that the state court is DIRECTED to vacate Count 1 of Petitioner's conviction. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall enter Judgment accordingly. It is further Ordered that, if Petitioner appeals the denial of his petition for habeas relief, any request for certificate of appealability is denied (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/19/2013. (MFR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?