Pauley v. Arizona, State of

Petitioner: Theodore Joseph Pauley
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 4:2010cv00390
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: Glenda E Edmonds (PS)
Presiding Judge: John M Roll
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 24 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner Theodore Joseph Pauleys 6 petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. This order shall serve as the Courts Judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge A Wallace Tashima on 4/3/14. (SMBE)
December 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Theodore Joseph Pauley. Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court deny the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 12/16/2013. (BAR) Modified on 12/18/2013 to reflect WO (BAR).
March 31, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Theodore Joseph Pauley. Recommendation to enter and order DISMISSING Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 3/31/11. (SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauley v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theodore Joseph Pauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?