Matthews v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Jennifer L Matthews
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 4:2011cv00290
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Guerin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel is awarded $20,401.50 less the $5,001.20 previously awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) resulting in a net award of $15,400.30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 8/22/13.(SMBE)
February 11, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 35 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff is awarded the sum of $5,001.20. The court will not order the Commissioner to issue payment directly to Matthews attorney. If the Government wishes to respond to the additional award, it may file a motion for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 2/11/13.(SMBE)
October 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on October 24, 2012.(BAR)
July 12, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; final decision of the Commissioner is reversed. The case isremanded for payment of benefits. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a judgment and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 7/12/12. (SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Matthews
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?