Wilson v. Alliant Techsystems Incorporated

Plaintiff: Scott P Wilson
Defendant: Alliant Techsystems Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2011cv00503
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Charles R Pyle
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 41 Report and Recommendations. It is Ordered this case is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 2/22/2013.(MFR)
May 16, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Amended Complaint filed by Scott P Wilson ; Plaintiff shall effectuate service, properly following the requirements of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on or before Friday, June 15, 2012. Within that same time period, a fter effectuating service, Plaintiff must provide this Court with proof of service that conforms to the requirements of Rule 4. IfPlaintiff fails to provide this Court with proof of service, the Court will dismiss Plaintiffs case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 05/15/12. (LMF)
February 3, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 11 Amended Complaint filed by Scott P Wilson. Plaintiffs general tort claim, Title VII claim, and fraud claim (Doc. 11 17-22) are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state aclaim to relief. The ADA claim (Doc. 11 8-16) survives dismissal. PlaintiffPlaintiff is responsible for effectuation service of process on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 02/02/12. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Alliant Techsystems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott P Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Techsystems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?