Lesofski v. Lash et al

Plaintiff: Edward G Lesofski
Defendant: David Epley, Tim Dunn, Don Lightener, Unknown Parties, Jerrod Lash, Susan Wagner and Arizona School of Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine
Case Number: 4:2011cv00840
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/29/2014.(BAR)
November 19, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff has 7 days to file copies of his responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses; granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Discovery due by 10/31/2014, Dispositive motions due by 11/14/2014. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 11/18/2013. See Order for Complete Details.(BAR)
November 1, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time (Doc. 133 ) is granted, and the case management deadlines in this case are reset as follows: Discovery due by 11/30/2013; Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2013; and Proposed Pretrial Ord er due by 1/31/2014. It is further Ordered that the Discovery Update (Doc. 138 ) filed by Plaintiff shall be sealed by the Clerk of the Court. It is further Ordered Plaintiff shall comply with the October 25 and November 1 deadlines for disclosing the past due discovery. It is further Ordered Plaintiffs deposition shall be taken in Montana via video or telephonically, according to Defendants choice (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 10/31/2013. (MFR)
September 25, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court denies as moot the defendants' discovery motions: 119 , 123 , 125 , 126 & 127 . Ordered granting the 128 Motion for Extension for Response to Defendants' Discovery to November 1, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/23/2013. (See order for complete details.)(BAR)
September 12, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant Lightener shall be dismissed from this case. Within 5 days of this Order, the Plaintiff shall refile the Second Amended Complaint. Granting request (Doc. 118), Rule 16 Scheduling Confer ence will be held telephonically with the Judge's law clerk on September 19, 2013 @ 10:00 AM. Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Hold Deposition Electronically 120 are denied as Moot. Plaintiffs deposition set on September 16, 2013, is QUASHED. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/11/13.(SMBE)
November 20, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff shall refile the Second Amended Complaint to reflect the named Defendants in the caption. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 11/19/12.(SMBE)
October 3, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff to show cause within 21 days why the Motion for Summary Judgment should not be granted in entirely. If the court grants the Motion in entirety, case shall be dismissed in its entire ty. FURTHER, denying 40 Motion for Hearing; FURTHE, granting 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with leave to amend First Amended Comlaint; Second Amended Complaint due with 21 days of this Order. FURTHER, granting 56 Motion f or Extension of Time Deadline to serve Defendant, extended 30 days from filing of 2nd Amended Complaint ; FURTHER, denying 61 Motion For Summary Disposition; FURTHER Denying as moot 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; FURTHER Denying as moot 66 Motion to Strike the Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 10/3/12.(SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesofski v. Lash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Epley
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dunn
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Lightener
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Lash
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wagner
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona School of Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine
Represented By: James E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward G Lesofski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?