Morgal v. Jacobs et al

Plaintiff: Allan Kenneth Morgal
Defendant: Anna M Jacobs, Edward Williams, Karyn E Klausner, Therese Schroeder, Charles L Ryan, Cheryl Dossett, Richard Pratt and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 4:2012cv00280
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Morgal's Objection to Costs (Doc. 205 ) is Sustained in Part and Overruled in Part. The Judgment on Taxation of Costs (Doc. 204 ) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Judgment on Taxation of Costs with costs taxed for Williams and against Morgal in the amount of $1,000. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/18/2016. (See attached PDF for complete information)(DLC)
April 5, 2016 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 184 Motion for Reconsideration.(CKJ, ej)
April 4, 2016 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Plaintiffs Expert Eldon Vails Opinions and Report; granting 130 Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Admission of Racial Disparity Testimony; granting 136 Motion in Limine #1: to Exclude Expe rt Opinions of Cameron Lindsay; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion in Limine #2: to Exclude Evidence of Irrelevant Instances of Conduct and Discipline of Plaintiff Allan K. Morgal, and; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion in Limine #6: to Exclude Criminal History.(CKJ, ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgal v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Kenneth Morgal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn E Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therese Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?