Halstead v. Ryan

Petitioner: James Randall Halstead
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 4:2012cv00291
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate Judge's 27 Report and Recommendation and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. The action is dismissed with prejudice. A Final Judgment shall enter separately. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 6/30/2014. (BAR)
April 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court enter an order denying the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by James Randall Halstead. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 4/14/2014. (BAR) Modified on 4/14/2014 to reflect WO (BAR).
July 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court enter an order dismissing the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by James Randall Halstead. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 7/26/2013. (BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halstead v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Randall Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Alan Liardon Amann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?