Fannie Mae v. Laruffa et al

Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Defendant: Anthony P Laruffa, John Grassia and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 4:2012cv00301
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED modifying the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 170 as to witness testimony. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Doc. 129 ) in full. It is further ORDERED accepting the 171 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Court hereby grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 146 ). Counsel shall file a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order within 30 days of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 2/20/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
March 12, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Remove Co-Defendant Grassia due to Fraudulent Evidence; granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Magistrate Judge Macdonald's 70 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 3/11/2013.(BAR)
July 2, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED BY DOC 29 -ORDERED that the Court adopts Magistrate Ferraro's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 21 . It is further ordered that defendant Laruffa's Motion to Dismiss or the Alternative Transfer Venue, and Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint are denied. It is further ordered referring this matter back to Judge Ferraro. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on July 2, 2012. (BAR) Modified on 7/2/2012 (BAR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fannie Mae v. Laruffa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: James Louis Ugalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony P Laruffa
Represented By: Clifford B Altfeld
Represented By: Carlos Francisco Negrete
Represented By: Clifford B Altfeld
Represented By: Carlos Francisco Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Grassia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?