Barten v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Bryan Barten
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv00399
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2014 463 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendant's 423 Motion for Leave to Depose Pamela Lauer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 11/21/14.(BAC)
September 23, 2014 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 368 Appeal of the Magistrate Judges Order is DENIED. The 367 Appeal of the Magistrate Judges Order is DENIED as moot. The Magistrate Judge is directed to modify the Fourth Amended Protective Order as indicated herein. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 9/22/14.(BAC)
July 1, 2014 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 348 Report and Recommendation. GRANTED IN PART 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTED IN PART 188 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENIED 354 Motion for Leave to File ; DENIED 186 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/30/14. (SMBE)
January 31, 2014 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants Objections to Magistrate Judges Order Denying Motion forProtective Order Re Information and Documents Pertaining to the Michigan AutoAdvancing Claims Excellence (ACE) Program are OVERRULED. (Doc. 303) re: 303 Objection filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/30/2014. (JKM)
October 11, 2013 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 251 Motion for Protective Order; denying 252 Motion for Leave to File exhibits under seal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/10/2013.(JKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barten v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P Bienstock
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Represented By: Shannon E Trebbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Barten
Represented By: Stanley G Feldman
Represented By: Thomas G Cotter
Represented By: James Louis Spagnuolo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?