Duarte v. Catalina Foothills School District No. 16

Plaintiff: Gary S Duarte
Defendant: Catalina Foothills School District No. 16
Case Number: 4:2012cv00844
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Pursuant to the status report of the parties, the status conference set for 12/8/14 at 11:30 a.m. is vacated; the status conference is reset for 2/2/15 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/4/14.
November 3, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: ACRD Determination. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/3/14.
October 10, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Rulings on trial related issues and attachments pertaining to trial (voir dire script, preliminary and final instructions, verdict form). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/10/14. (JAS, kr)
October 8, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Disputed Final Jury Instruction. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/8/14. (JAS, kr)
October 2, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 10/3/14 and 10/9/14 deadlines (jury instructions, voir dire, verdict form). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/2/14. (JAS, kr)
September 5, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court is in the process of reviewing the parties filings from 8/29/14 and 9/2/14. See Docs. 56 through 64. The Court notes that it has not received Word copies of these documents yet. See Doc. 50 (7/31/14 Order at p. 1: [T]he parties sh all email Word copies of the [jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and motions in limine] to chambers (soto_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov)). As such, by 9/8/14, the parties shall email Word copies of these documents to chambers; Word copies of the responses to the motions in limine shall also be emailed to chambers.. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/5/14.
August 15, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/15/14.
August 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/1/14.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte v. Catalina Foothills School District No. 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S Duarte
Represented By: Jenne Sandy Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Foothills School District No. 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?